State of Hawaii v. Kaiama

Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Defendant: Dexter K. Kaiama
Case Number: 1:2019cv00230
Filed: May 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
2 Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion for Remand filed by Dexter K. Kaiama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State v English Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit State v English Transcript, #3 Exhibit PCA Case Repository, #4 Exhibit Regency Proclamation 10 October 2014, #5 Exhibit Regency Proclamation 3 June 2019)(Laudig, Stephen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 EO: COURT ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR AN EXTENSION AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE. granting in part and denying in part #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION to Remand ; granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion to Continue; #4 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2019 at 09:45 AM is continued to 7/19/2019 at 09:45 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Remand filed by State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Evers, James)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 EO: terminating #14 Motion to Strike. Document is a certificate of service. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Service #13 First MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Remand, #11 First MOTION to Strike #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Censure, #12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Remand Certificate of Service Stephen Laudig appearing for Defendant Dexter K. Kaiama (Laudig, Stephen) Modified on 6/17/2019 to terminated motion and to modify docket text to certificate of service in place of first motion (cib).
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION to Continue Hearing on #4 Motion to Remand Stephen Laudig appearing for Defendant Dexter K. Kaiama (Laudig, Stephen) Modified on 6/17/2019 to add underlying motion to remand docket number to docket text (cib).
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Remand Stephen Laudig appearing for Defendant Dexter K. Kaiama (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Laudig, Stephen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION In Liminie #1 To Exclude, or STRIKE, Matter From Plaintiff's Memorandum Exhibit re #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Censure Stephen Laudig appearing for Defendant Dexter K. Kaiama (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Laudig, Stephen). Added MOTION in Limine on 6/17/2019 (cib).
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Continuance of Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by State of Hawaii re 9 Set Hearings, #3 (Evers, James)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 6/5/2019 to 8/14/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. Plaintiff shall notify Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION to Remand : Motion Hearing is set for 7/12/2019 at 10:30 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Hawaii re #4 MOTION to Remand , #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Evers, James)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Bank Trust NA v. Fonoti, 2018 WL 3433295 (USDC HI 2018), #2 Exhibit B - US Bank Trust NA v. Fonoti, 2018 WL 3431923 (USDC HI 2018), #3 Exhibit C - USDS info re Dexter Kaiama, #4 Exhibit D - Order of Public Censure, #5 Declaration of John N. Tokunaga)(Evers, James)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand James F. Evers appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Evers, James)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI'S REFERRED CIVIL CASES - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/8/2019. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00230 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings, EFFECTIVE 5/13/2019 . (emt, )
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/5/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
May 6, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. Re: The docket number #1 Notice of Removal filed by Dexter K. Kaiama ~ The filing party may refer to LR100.5.1., which states "The name of the CM/ECF user under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must be preceded by "/s/" and typed in the space where the signature otherwise would appear (e.g. /s/ John or Jane Lawyer)." No further action necessary. (emt, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00230 LEK-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
May 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to United States District Court and Notice of Reservation of Objection to Jurisdiction and Intent to File Motion to Transfer to U.S.D.C. for the District of Columbia by Dexter K Kaiama from Circuit of Hawaii, First Circuit, case number 19-1-0609-04, 09th Div. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2196399), filed by Dexter K Kaiama. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Judgment, #3 PCA Case Repository, #4 Appointment, #5 U.N. Communication)(Laudig, Stephen) Modified on 5/6/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Hawaii v. Kaiama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter K. Kaiama
Represented By: Stephen Laudig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Represented By: James F. Evers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?