Warren, et al v. United States of America, et al

Plaintiff: John David Warren, Jr. and Laura Warren
Defendant: Kapiolani Medical Specialists, Devin Puapong, M.D., United States of America, Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc. and Doe Defendants 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00232
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
2 Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/1/2019. Pursuant to LR 16.5(b), all parties to this matter are hereby ORDERED TO APPEAR for a settlement conference, beginning in chambers, on October 27, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. (jo)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/1/2019. (jo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 7/1/2019. Based on the parties' representations regarding anticipated discovery and third party liability issues, the Court will issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Order setting trial and related dates as requested. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 1/26/2021 in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference statements by 10/20/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/26/2020. Discovery due by 11/27/2020. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:00 a.m - 9:15 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
June 27, 2019 Filing 21 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by John David Warren, Jr, Laura Warren. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sheehan, Loretta)
June 27, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY: Please be advised docket entries #17 , #18 , and #20 , filed by Devin Puapong, M.D., Kapiolani Medical Specialists, Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc., contain an incorrect case number. The correct case number is: CIVIL NO. 19-00232 JMS-WRP. Please include this information on future filings. No further action necessary. (jo)
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 Hawaii Pacific Health, Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc., Kapiolani Medical Specialists, and Devin Puapong, M.D.'s ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc., Kapiolani Medical Specialists, Devin Puapong, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Van Dyke, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Amalia L. Fenton on behalf of John David Warren, Jr, Laura Warren on behalf of John David Warren, Jr, Laura Warren. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fenton, Amalia)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc., Kapiolani Medical Specialists, Devin Puapong, M.D.. (Van Dyke, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Van Dyke, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement ; COS. (Yee, Harry)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement Rule 16 by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sheehan, Loretta)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Planning Meeting by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sheehan, Loretta)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of Loretta A. Sheehan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Sheehan, Loretta)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Warren, John David Warren, Jr. Defendant United States of America served on 5/23/2019, through Lynden Shigezawa. (Sheehan, Loretta) Docket Text Modified on 5/31/2019 (jo)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Warren, John David Warren, Jr. Defendant Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc. served on 5/23/2019, through Charles Ching, General Counsel. (Sheehan, Loretta) Docket Text Modified on 5/31/2019 (jo)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Warren, John David Warren, Jr. Defendant Kapiolani Medical Specialists served on 5/23/2019, through V. Balaraman, Associate CMO. (Sheehan, Loretta) Docket Text Modified on 5/31/2019 (jo)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Warren, John David Warren, Jr. Defendant Devin Puapong, M.D. served on 5/29/2019 through John Nishimoto, Esq. (Sheehan, Loretta) Docket Text Modified on 5/31/2019 (jo)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI'S REFERRED CIVIL CASES - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/8/2019. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00232 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings, EFFECTIVE 5/13/2019. (emt, )
May 6, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. - Document Not Signed - Please be advised that document #2 is not signed with the e-filing signature.The filing party may refer to LR100.5.1., which states "The name of the CM/ECF user under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must be preceded by "/s/" and typed in the space where the signature otherwise would appear (e.g. /s/ John or Jane Lawyer)". No further action necessary. (cib)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc., Kapiolani Medical Specialists, Devin Puapong, M.D., United States of America. (cib)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 7/1/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00232-JMS-RLP on all further pleadings. (cib)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Sheehan, Loretta)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2196752.), filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sheehan, Loretta)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 Summons (Proposed) (Sheehan, Loretta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren, et al v. United States of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Warren, Jr.
Represented By: Michael K. Livingston
Represented By: Loretta A. Sheehan
Represented By: Mark S. Davis
Represented By: Amalia L. Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Warren
Represented By: Michael K. Livingston
Represented By: Loretta A. Sheehan
Represented By: Mark S. Davis
Represented By: Amalia L. Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kapiolani Medical Specialists
Represented By: Michael J. Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Puapong, M.D.
Represented By: Michael J. Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Harry Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Pacific Health Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?