Miran v. Boyd Gaming Corporation, et al

Plaintiff: Jaelyn Miran
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Boyd Gaming Corporation, Doe Entities 1-10 and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00252
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/19 @ 9:00 AM is vacated. Parties have reached a settlement. Stipuplation for Dismissal is due by 7/17/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Ho, Christy)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Schmitt, Randall)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Schmitt, Randall)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant California Hotel and Casino dba California Hotel and Casino (incorrectly identified as Boyd Gaming Corporation) ANSWER to Complaint filed on November 29.2018 by Boyd Gaming Corporation.(Schmitt, Randall)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from Circuit Court of the First Circuit - State of Hawaii; Their Case Number: CV 19-1-1915-11 DEO. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate - Computerized Index - Civil Information Sheet, #2 Circuit Court of the First Circuit State of Hawaii case record) (cib)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boyd Gaming Corporation identifying Other Affiliate California Hotel and Casino, a Nevada corporation dba California Hotel and Casino for Boyd Gaming Corporation.. (Schmitt, Randall)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/17/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00252-LEK-RT on all further pleadings. (cib)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Boyd Gaming Corporation from In the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 18-1-1915-11. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2202321), filed by Boyd Gaming Corporation (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Randall K. Schmitt, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schmitt, Randall) Modified to correct defendant's name on 5/15/2019 (cib, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miran v. Boyd Gaming Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd Gaming Corporation
Represented By: Randall K. Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaelyn Miran
Represented By: Christy L. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?