Estacion v. Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC dba Legacy Hilo Rehabilitation & Nursing Center et al

Plaintiff: Arlene M. Estacion
Defendant: Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC dba Legacy Hilo Rehabilitation & Nursing Center, Andre Hurst and Benjamin Meeker
Case Number: 1:2019cv00255
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 Plaintiff Arlene Estacion's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 Errata re #13 Answer to Complaint (Mis-Filed As Document No. 13 And Correctly Filed As Document No. 15). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Osaki, Carl)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC dba Legacy Hilo Rehabilitation & Nursing Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Osaki, Carl)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Osaki, Carl)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 *Refiled at ECF #15 * ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC dba Legacy Hilo Rehabilitation & Nursing Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Osaki, Carl) Docket Text Modified on 7/11/2019 (jo)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Planning Meeting (Joint Rule 26(f) Report Of Meeting Of The Parties). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Osaki, Carl)
June 21, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - a copy of the 11 EO has been served by First Class Mail to Plaintiff at her address of record on 06/21/2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (mansfield2)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 EO: On June 17, 2019, Plaintiff Arlene M. Estacion ("Plaintiff") filed her Ex Parte Application to Register to E-File in the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii as Non-Attorney ("Application"). ECF No. 8. Plaintiff is appearing pro se and lives in Hilo, Hawaii. The Application seeks permission for Plaintiff to utilize the court's electronic filing system. See id. at 2. Local Rule 100.2.2.1 provides that "[a]ny person appearing pro se may not utilize electronic filing without leave of the court, which decision rests in the discretion of the assigned district or magistrate judge." LR100.2.2.1. Plaintiff asserts that good cause exists to grant her Application because filing electronically "will avoid additional unnecessary expenses of filing and will add to the efficiency of the filing process for Plaintiff, Defendants, and the Court." ECF No. 8 at 2. Such concerns, however, are not uncommon to pro se plaintiffs litigating in this district court. Moreover, although electronic filing would obviate the need for Plaintiff to mail her documents to the Clerk's Office for filing, Plaintiff would still be required to mail courtesy copies of any filings. See LR7.7. Thus, allowing Plaintiff to file documents electronically would not eliminate mailing expenses.Based on the foregoing, the Court exercises its discretion to DENY the Application at this time. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 06/21/2019. (mansfield2)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ARLENE M. ESTACION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REGISTER TO E-FILE IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF HAWAII AS A NON-ATTORNEY re: #8 (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF ARLENE ESTACION'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REGISTER TO E-FILE IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF HAWAII AS A NON-ATTORNEY - by Plaintiff Arlene M. Estacion (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Filing fee received: $400.00; receipt number HI026629 re #4 (jo)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS BENJAMIN MEEKER AND ANDRE HURST'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT, FILED MAY 16, 2019 re: #5 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 6/5/2019. (jo)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 5, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY: Please be advised that document #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint filed by Benjamin Meeker, Andre Hurst, Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC dba Legacy Hilo Rehabilitation & Nursing Center includes a Proposed Order for Judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the Order in word format to the applicable chambers email address. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations and LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (jo)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint Carl H. Osaki appearing for Defendants Andre Hurst, Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC dba Legacy Hilo Rehabilitation & Nursing Center, Benjamin Meeker (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Carl H. Osaki, #2 Order Granting Motion, #3 Certificate of Service)(Osaki, Carl)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re: #2 "Accordingly, Plaintiff's IFP Application is DENIED. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, she must remit the $400 civil filing fee to the Clerk of Court by June 21, 2019. Failure to do so will result in the automatic dismissal of this action. IT IS SO ORDERED." Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/20/2019 (jo)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - On May 21, 2019, Plaintiff will be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 7/15/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) (jo)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION To Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) - filed by Plaintiff Arlene M. Estacion (jo)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR A CIVIL CASE against All Defendants - filed by Arlene M. Estacion (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estacion v. Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC dba Legacy Hilo Rehabilitation & Nursing Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC dba Legacy Hilo Rehabilitation & Nursing Center
Represented By: Carl H. Osaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Hurst
Represented By: Carl H. Osaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Meeker
Represented By: Carl H. Osaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene M. Estacion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?