Clark Enterprises, Inc. dba Paragon Sailing Charters Maui et al
Plaintiff: Alihilani Yacht Charters, Inc. and Clark Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Denise Ortiz
In Re: In The Matter Of:
Case Number: 1:2019cv00261
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:761
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 EO: Counsel Brian Otis Felder request a continuance in the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference until after the September 1, 2019 deadline for filing claims. Request is granted. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 07/22/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 09/10/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 09/03/2019. Parties have been notified. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alihilani Yacht Charters, Inc., Clark Enterprises, Inc. re 13 Link,, of ECF 1, 7, 10, 11 & 12 on Denise Ortiz and Her Counsel of Record and Initiation of Publication of Monition in Maui News (Felder, Brian)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 EO: Petitioner's counsel is instructed to effectuate service of the following four documents: (1) Complaint (ECF 1); (2) Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Letter of Undertaking (ECF 10); (3) Order Restraining Prosecution of Claims Against Owners and Issuance of Monition Directing Claimants to File and Make Proof of Claims (ECF 11); and (4) Monition (ECF 12) on Denise Ortiz, who is described as a potential litigant in paragraphs #6 -7 of the Complaint (ECF 1) and on her counsel of record. Petitioner is instructed to effectuate service within seven days of the date of this Order and to file a certificate of service evidencing the same. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 MONITION re #9 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 6/18/2019. (emt, )
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS AGAINST OWNERS AND ISSUANCE OF MONITION DIRECTING CLAIMANTS TO FILE AND MAKE PROOF OF CLAIMS re #9 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 6/18/2019. (emt, )
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION FOR VALUE & LETTER OF UNDERTAKING re #8 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 6/18/2019. (emt, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 EX PARTE Application for Rule F Order and Monition Brian Otis Felder appearing for Plaintiffs Alihilani Yacht Charters, Inc., Clark Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Rule F Monition, #10 Rule F Order)(Felder, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, by Alihilani Yacht Charters, Inc., Clark Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Undertaking, #2 Proposed Order)(Felder, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Denise Ortiz, filed by Clark Enterprises, Inc., Alihilani Yacht Charters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Felder, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Alihilani Yacht Charters, Inc., Clark Enterprises, Inc.. (Felder, Brian)
May 24, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY: Please be advised docket entry #2 contains the wrong attachment. The filing party may re-file their Civil Cover Sheet. (jo)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 7/22/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) (jo) Modified on 5/28/2019 (emt, ). ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00261 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings.(jo)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 INITIAL FRCP 7.1. DISCLOSURE by Alihilani Yacht Charters, Inc., Clark Enterprises, Inc. dba Paragon Sailing Charters Maui. (Felder, Brian) Modified on 5/28/2019 (emt, ).
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 [CIVIL Cover Sheet] FRCP 7.1. DISCLOSURE by Alihilani Yacht Charters, Inc., Clark Enterprises, Inc. dba Paragon Sailing Charters Maui. (Felder, Brian) Modified on 5/28/2019 (emt, ).
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY against filed by Clark Enterprises, Inc. dba Paragon Sailing Charters Maui, Alihilani Yacht Charters, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2207144.), (Felder, Brian) Docket Text Modified on 5/24/2019 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark Enterprises, Inc. dba Paragon Sailing Charters Maui et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alihilani Yacht Charters, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Otis Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Otis Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In The Matter Of:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?