Michael Sunga v. Ramon Sunga
Plaintiff: Michael Sunga
Defendant: Ramon Sunga
Case Number: 1:2019cv00268
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 57 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Scheduling Conference previously set for 11/05/2019 IS CONTINUED ONE DAY TO 11/06/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are now due by 10/30/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY Memorandum in Further Support of #39 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ramon Sunga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A; Tax Fact 2010-1, October 2010 - Understanding HARPTA - tax-facts-hi-tax-2010)(Scofield, David) Docket text modified on 9/16/2019 (emt, ).
September 11, 2019 Filing 55 EO: On September 10, 2019, Defendant Ramon Sunga filed:FIRST STIPULATED JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (DOC. No. 39). (ECF No. 54).The Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Reply is due September 13, 2019. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(tl, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction David W. Scofield appearing for Defendant Ramon Sunga (Scofield, David)
September 5, 2019 Filing 53 EP: FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE held. Counsel Adam T. Snow and Jeffrey Scott Humphrey participating via telephone.Discussion held.Scheduling Conference is set for November 5, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield. Any updated scheduling conference statements are due by October 29, 2019.If the parties so wish to hold an Early Settlement Conference with the Court, they may do so by contacting Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield's Courtroom Manager, Bernie Aurio at (808) 541-1298.(FTR-Ctrm C6 9:30 - 9:38.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 52 Scheduling Conference Statement with Certificate of Service. (Humphrey, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2019 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Michael Sunga in Support of #50 Opposition to #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Certificate of Service AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Certificate of Service filed by Michael Sunga. (Humphrey, Jeffrey) Docket text modified on 8/28/2019 (emt, ).
August 27, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Certificate of Service filed by Michael Sunga. (Humphrey, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2019 Filing 49 On July 31, 2019, Defendant Ramon Sunga filed:DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (ECF No. 39).Plaintiff Michael Sunga shall file his Opposition on or before Tuesday, August 27, 2019.Defendant Ramon Sunga shall file his Reply on or before Tuesday, September 10, 2019.A hearing on Defendant's Motion To Dismiss (ECF No. 39) shall be held on Monday, October 21, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., before the Honorable Helen Gillmor. (tl, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JEFFREY SCOTT HUMPHREY re #47 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 8/12/2019. (emt, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Jeffrey Scott Humphrey) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2246295.Adam T. Snow appearing for Plaintiff Michael Sunga (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Certificate of Service)(Snow, Adam)
August 12, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam T. Snow on behalf of Michael Sunga on behalf of Michael Sunga. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Snow, Adam)
August 6, 2019 Filing 45 EP: STATUS CONFERENCE held. No appearance made by the Plaintiffs. 3 call were made telephonically to counsel Jeffrey Scott Humphrey at 9:30 a.m., no response.Status Conference is continued to September 5, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield.If the parties so wish to hold an Early Settlement Conference with the Court, they may do so by contacting Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield's Courtroom Manager, Bernie Aurio at (808) 541-1298.(FTR-Ctrm C6 9:30 - 9:37.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 5, 2019 Filing 44 EO: Court GRANTS #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at August 6, 2019, Scheduling Hearing. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 1, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - a copy of the 43 EO has been served by First Class Mail to Jeffrey Scott Humphrey at his address of record on 08/01/2019. The Court also left a voicemail at Mr. Humphrey's telephone number of record on 08/01/2019, notifying him of the 43 EO and its contents. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (mansfield2)
August 1, 2019 Filing 43 EO: A motion to appear pro hac vice as to Jeffrey Scott Humphrey shall be filed no later than 08/07/2019. Please refer to LR83.1(e) of the Local Rules for the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii with respect to the submission of applications for pro hac vice admittance and the designation of local counsel (a member in good standing of the bar of this court who maintains an office within this district). The "Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Declaration of Counsel Package" (Form HID007-007a) is available on the court's website, www.hid.uscourts.gov (see Forms section, subsection "Miscellaneous"). The filing fee is $300.00 per attorney, per case. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD) (mansfield2)
August 1, 2019 Filing 42 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendant Ramon Sunga. (Scofield, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION re 31 Set Hearings, for Leave to Appear Telephonically at August 6, 2019, Scheduling Hearing David W. Scofield appearing for Defendant Ramon Sunga (Scofield, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ramon Sunga.(Scofield, David)
July 31, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction David W. Scofield appearing for Defendant Ramon Sunga (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #2 Declaration of Ramon Sunga in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ramon Sunga-- Exclusive Right-to-Sell Listing Contract, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ramon Sunga-- Final Exchange Statement, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Ramon Sunga-- Purchase Contract Honuhula Pl, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Ramon Sunga-- Email Chain Between Michael and Ramon Sunga)(Scofield, David)
July 25, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - a copy of the 37 EO has been served by First Class Mail to Jeffrey Scott Humphrey at his address of record on 07/25/2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (mansfield2)
July 18, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #38 WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT RAMON SUNGA; ORDER has been served by First Class Mail to Jeffrey Scott Humphrey, Esq. at the address of record on July 18, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT RAMON SUNGA; ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 7/18/2019. Attorney Matthew K. Chung terminated. (emt, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 37 EO: The Court GRANTS IN PART Defendant Ramon Sunga's #35 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Filed December 27, 2018. Defendant's answer to the Complaint is due August 1, 2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 07/18/2019. (mansfield2)
July 17, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Scofield on behalf of Ramon Sunga on behalf of Ramon Sunga. (Scofield, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 35 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To Complaint Filed December 27, 2018 Matthew K. Chung appearing for Defendant Ramon Sunga (Chung, Matthew)
July 11, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - a copy of the 34 EO has been served by First Class Mail to Jeffrey Humphrey at his address of record on 07/11/2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (mansfield2)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 EO: The Court has received Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel ("Motion"). ECF No. 33. Local Rule 83.6(b) of the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii ("Local Rules") provides, in relevant part, that "[n]o attorney will be permitted to be substituted as attorney of record in any pending action without leave of court. An attorney who has appeared in a case may seek to withdraw on motion showing good cause." A motion to withdraw must specify the grounds for withdrawal, as well as and the name, address, and telephone number of the client. The attorney's notice to the client must inform him that he is personally responsible for complying with all court orders and deadlines. See LR83.6(b); Nat'l Career College, Inc. v. Spellings, Civil No. 07-00075 HG-LEK 2007 WL 2048776, at *1 (D. Haw. July 11, 2007). The Motion fails to specify the address and telephone number of Ramon Sunga. The Motion also fails to inform Mr. Sunga that he is personally responsible for complying with all court orders and deadlines. Accordingly, the Court DENIES the Motion without prejudice to a new motion that fully complies with Local Rule 83.6(b). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 07/11/2019. (mansfield2)
July 3, 2019 Filing 33 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney For Defendant Ramon Sunga Matthew K. Chung appearing for Defendant Ramon Sunga (Chung, Matthew)
June 26, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 32 Amended EO has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 06/26/2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (bbb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 32 AMENDED 31 EO: In light of 30 , the Court CONTINUES the 07/01/2019 Status Conference TO 08/06/2019 at 09:30 a.m., in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements due by 07/31/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 25, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 31 Continuing Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and 30 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record for Mr. Jeffrey Scott Humphrey, Esq., on June 25, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (mansfield1)
June 21, 2019 Filing 31 EO: In light of 30 , the Court CONTINUES the 07/01/2019 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference TO 09:30 AM on 8/6/2019, in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements must be filed, and courtesy copies of the statements must be sent to the Clerk's Office, no later than 07/31/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield1)
June 21, 2019 Filing 30 EO: Having reviewed #27 Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to File Defendant's Answer to Complaint filed January 27, 2018 ("Application"), the Court finds good cause to GRANT Defendant's Application for an additional thirty days to answer the January 27, 2018 Complaint filed in California and transferred to Hawaii on May 28, 2019. Defendant must file an answer to the Complaint by July 18, 2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 06/21/2019. (mansfield1)
June 20, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #29 WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT RAMON SUNGA; ORDER shall be served by First Class Mail to John A. S. Baik, Esq. and Jeffrey Scott Humphrey, Esq. at the addresses of record on June 21, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT RAMON SUNGA; ORDER re #26 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 6/20/2019. Attorney John A S Baik terminated. (emt, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Ramon Sunga. Amendment to #27 Ex Parte APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Defendant's Answer to Complaint Amended Certificate of Service for Ex Parte Application to Extend Time To File Defendant's Answer To Complaint filed 12/27/18. (Chung, Matthew)
June 18, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. Please be advised that the Certificate of Service to docket number #27 Ex Parte APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Defendant's Answer to Complaint filed by Ramon Sunga, reflects that service was made via U.S. Mail "and/or by the EM/ECF electronic filing system". The filing party is advised that, because the document was entered using a filing event from the "Ex Parte" filings category, access to the document is restricted to the filing party and the court. For future reference, the more appropriate filing event, "Extension of Time to File Answer", is located under the "Motions" category. (emt, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 27 EX PARTE Application To Extend Time To File Answer To Plaintiff's Complaint filed 12/27/18 Matthew K. Chung appearing for Defendant Ramon Sunga (Chung, Matthew) Modified on 6/18/2019 to reflect this filing as a pending motion (emt, ).
June 17, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. If the filing party has not already done so, the docket number #26 Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Ramon Sunga; Order; and Certificate of Service [entered in CM/ECF as a "First MOTION to Substitute Attorney"] filed by Ramon Sunga, shall be submitted for consideration to Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield at mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations and LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (emt, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 26 [First MOTION to Substitute Attorney] Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Ramon Sunga; (Proposed) Order; and Certificate of Service Matthew K. Chung appearing for Defendant Ramon Sunga (Chung, Matthew) Modified on 6/17/2019 (emt, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 25 [NOTICE of Appearance] Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Ramon Sunga; (Proposed) Order; and Certificate of Service by Matthew K. Chung on behalf of Ramon Sunga on behalf of Ramon Sunga. (Chung, Matthew) Modified on 6/17/2019 (emt, ).
May 29, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 22 Notice of Case Assignment, 23 Notice to Counsel and Non E-Filers, #24 Order Setting Status Conference and Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Declaration of Counsel Packet (HID 007-007a) have been served by First Class Mail to Jeffrey Scott Humphrey, Esq. and John A. S. Baik, Esq. at the addresses of record on May 29, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/29/2019. ( Status Conference is set for 7/1/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD.) (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND NON E-FILERS: The Clerk of Court for the U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii gives notice of its receipt of the electronic case record for Civil Case 2:18-cv-10717-VAP-MAA; Michael Sunga v. Ramon Sunga, transferred from the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California (Western Division - Los Angeles). Please be advised that this case has been assigned to Senior U.S. District Judge Helen Gillmor and U.S. Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield. Please reflect Civil Case Number: CV 19-00268 HG-KJM on all further filings in this case. Submission of Pro Hac Vice Applications: Please refer to LR83.1(e) of the Local Rules for the District of Hawaii with respect to the submission of applications for pro hac vice admittance and the designation of local counsel (a member in good standing of the bar of this court who maintains an office within this district). The "Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Declaration of Counsel Package" (Form HID007-007a) is available on the court's website, www.hid.uscourts.gov (see Forms section, subsection "Miscellaneous"). The filing fee is $300.00 per attorney, per case. On January 1, 2014, this court implemented mandatory electronic filing, see LR100.2.1. The Local Rules for the District of Hawaii, as well as information concerning CM/ECF registration are available on the court's website, www.hid.uscourts.gov. (emt, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00268 HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-10717. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Order GRANTING IN PART Defendant Ramon Sunga's Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Doc. No. 15) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court therefore GRANTS IN PART Defendant Ramon Sunga's Motion to Dismiss and TRANSFERS this case to the United States District Court in the District of Hawaii. Electronic docket sheet sent. Electronic documents are available through PACER. (see document for further details) (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS): COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion, the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal and Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue #15 , set for 4/15/2019, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. This matter is appropriate for resolution without hearing pursuant to See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15, and will stand submitted on the papers timely filed. No appearance by counsel will be necessary by Judge Virginia A. Phillips THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue #15 filed by Defendant Ramon Sunga. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Response to Evidentiary Objection)(Baik, John) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 Objection Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue #15 filed by Plaintiff Michael Sunga. (Humphrey, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue #15 filed by Plaintiff Michael Sunga. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Scott Humphrey, #2 Declaration Michael Sunga)(Humphrey, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by defendant Ramon Sunga. Motion set for hearing on 4/15/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Declaration of Ramon Sunga) (Baik, John) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #13 RE: Motion to Dismiss #12 by Clerk of Court. Document is STRICKEN. Moving party shall re-filed motion in accordance with the Local Rules and this Court's Standing Order. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): Hearing date should be noticed for 28 days from the filing of the motion. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by defendant Ramon Sunga. Motion set for hearing on 4/1/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Ramon Sunga) (Attorney John A S Baik added to party Ramon Sunga(pty:dft)) (Baik, John) Modified on 3/15/2019 (bm). [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Ramon Sunga. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form, #9 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #7 filed by Plaintiff Michael Sunga. (Humphrey, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Summons Request #2 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 12/31/2018. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Sunga, identifying none. (Humphrey, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Sunga. (Humphrey, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 **STRICKEN** Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Sunga. (Humphrey, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/28/2018 Per Response #9 (iv). [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22961665 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michael Sunga. (Attorney Jeffrey Scott Humphrey added to party Michael Sunga(pty:pla))(Humphrey, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Sunga v. Ramon Sunga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sunga
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Humphrey
Represented By: Adam T. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Sunga
Represented By: John A S Baik
Represented By: Matthew K. Chung
Represented By: David W. Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?