Trustees of the Roofers Union Local 221 Trust Funds v. Ultimate Roofing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vacation & Holiday Trust Fund, Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Roofers Union Local 221 Trust Funds, Pension Fund, Training Fund and Health & Welfare Fund
Defendant: Ultimate Roofing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00281
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK in favor of Plaintiffs Annuity Fund, Health & Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Training Fund, Trustees of the Roofers Union Local 221 Trust Funds, Vacation & Holiday Trust Fund against Defendant Ultimate Roofing, Inc. (jo)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST Default Judgment by Trustees of the Roofers Union Local 221 Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jerry P.S. Chang, #2 Declaration of Noelle Tagaban, #3 Statement of Amounts Due, #4 [Proposed] Default Judgment, #5 Certificate of Service)(Chang, Jerry)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 EO: Based on the entry of default, ECF No. #9 , the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 is vacated. No later than 8/7/2019, Plaintiffs shall file the appropriate motion for default judgment. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendant Ultimate Roofing, Inc. re: #8 (jo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST Entry of Default by Trustees of the Roofers Union Local 221 Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jerry P.S. Chang, #2 [proposed] Entry of Default, #3 Exhibit A)(Chang, Jerry)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Roofers Union Local 221 Trust Funds. All Defendants served on 6/12/2019 through Gentis NK Tangaro. (Ikeda, Ashley) Docket Text Modified on 6/19/2019 (jo)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ultimate Roofing, Inc. (jo)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 7/29/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00281 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Trustees of the Roofers Union Local 221 Trust Funds. (Chang, Jerry)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2211181.), filed by Trustees of the Roofers Union Local 221 Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 [Proposed] Summons)(Chang, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Roofers Union Local 221 Trust Funds v. Ultimate Roofing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultimate Roofing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vacation & Holiday Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annuity Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Roofers Union Local 221 Trust Funds
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Training Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?