Apilado v. Bank of America, N.A.

Plaintiff: Alejandro G. Dela Cruz, Laura Makenna, Kris A. Rodriguez, Deborah R. Vallejo, Mary N. Pastore, Modesto D. P. Tadiarca, Jr., Genesis K. Willis, Randall K. Jim, Jonathan M. Julian, Edward T. Nagata, Holly H. K. Kaakimaka, Leo C. Valencia, Sharon J. Gray, William Fruen, Shannon M. P. Apilando, Roland M. Kam, Dustin G. K. Apilando, Charleen M. A. Tinao, Dyron B. Castulo, Peter P. Marquardt, Phillip Vallejo, Leigh A. Kadooka, Dale E. Sims, Aubrey S. Renteria, Thomas J. Masterson, Sharon N. Tominaga, Romaine M. Edwards, Brenda A. Phillips, Darin M. Jones, Lois E. Robinson, Robert C. Pastore, Jr., Laola T. Malaluan, Nolan T. Caballero, Sr., Filomena C. Dela Cruz, George T. Tolmachoff, Kamehalyn Y. Santos, Carol E. Cobia, Dean F. Willis, Jason P. Malaluan, Juan C. Fox, Patrick K. Fernandez, Joni A. Pitcher, Cary F. Pitcher, Pearl K. Nagata, Pat T. Kadooka, Madonna T. Machado, Marilynn E. Tolmachoff, Marcia May, Amelia B. Valencia, Francisco M. Apilado, Judy A. D'Ambrosio, Russell R. Higgins, Paul Y. Tominaga, Nicholas J. D'Ambrosio, Shirley D. Renteria, Thomas E. Gray, Marian R. Apilado, Elizabeth M. Spector, John J. Edwards, Donald C. Beaumonte, Jr., Darius A. Jamal, Mynor S. Roque, Marie B. Drury, Nowlin P. Correa, Danielle K. Caballero, Maria E. Masterson, Rolando M. Tirso, Chadwick K. Phillips, Sr. and Patricia R. Fruean
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50 and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00285
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
2 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Word Count, #2 Declaration Declaration of Patricia J. McHenry, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Certificate of Service)(McHenry, Patricia)
August 2, 2019 Filing 22 EO: Hearing on #13 Motion for Order of Remand currently set for 8/23/2019 at 9:30 AM is CONTINUED to 1:00 PM on the SAME DAY in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ROBERT A. MUCKENFUSS re #20 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 7/18/2019. (emt, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re Robert A. Muckenfuss Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2232770.Patricia J. McHenry appearing for Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (McHenry, Patricia)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ELIZABETH M. Z. TIMMERMANS re #17 , #18 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 7/15/2019. (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Amended) Elizabeth M.Z. Timmermans Filing fee $ 300.Patricia J. McHenry appearing for Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (McHenry, Patricia)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth M.Z. Timmermans Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2229206.Patricia J. McHenry appearing for Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (McHenry, Patricia)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE not held.Discussion held regarding pending motions and the status on the other related cases.Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is vacated. Status Conference is set for September 25, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Mansfield in Courtroom 6. (FTR-Ctrm C6 9:05 - 9:17.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 EO: Hearing on #9 Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint set for 9/6/2019 at 9:30 AM is CONTINUED to 10/11/2019 at 9:30 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #13 Motion for Order of Remand:Motion Hearing is SET for 8/23/2019 at 9:30 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. (shm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand James J. Bickerton appearing for Plaintiffs Francisco M. Apilado, Marian R. Apilado, Dustin G. K. Apilando, Shannon M. P. Apilando, Donald C. Beaumonte, Jr, Danielle K. Caballero, Nolan T. Caballero, Sr, Dyron B. Castulo, Carol E. Cobia, Nowlin P. Correa, Judy A. D'Ambrosio, Nicholas J. D'Ambrosio, Alejandro G. Dela Cruz, Filomena C. Dela Cruz, Marie B. Drury, John J. Edwards, Romaine M. Edwards, Patrick K. Fernandez, Juan C. Fox, Patricia R. Fruean, William Fruen, Sharon J. Gray, Thomas E. Gray, Russell R. Higgins, Darius A. Jamal, Randall K. Jim, Darin M. Jones, Jonathan M. Julian, Holly H. K. Kaakimaka, Leigh A. Kadooka, Pat T. Kadooka, Roland M. Kam, Madonna T. Machado, Laura Makenna, Jason P. Malaluan, Laola T. Malaluan, Peter P. Marquardt, Maria E. Masterson, Thomas J. Masterson, Marcia May, Edward T. Nagata, Pearl K. Nagata, Mary N. Pastore, Robert C. Pastore, Jr, Brenda A. Phillips, Chadwick K. Phillips, Sr, Cary F. Pitcher, Joni A. Pitcher, Shirley D. Renteria, Aubrey S. Renteria, Lois E. Robinson, Kris A. Rodriguez, Mynor S. Roque, Kamehalyn Y. Santos, Dale E. Sims, Elizabeth M. Spector, Modesto D. P. Tadiarca, Jr, Charleen M. A. Tinao, Rolando M. Tirso, George T. Tolmachoff, Marilynn E. Tolmachoff, Paul Y. Tominaga, Sharon N. Tominaga, Amelia B. Valencia, Leo C. Valencia, Deborah R. Vallejo, Phillip Vallejo, Dean F. Willis, Genesis K. Willis (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of James J. Bickerton, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Certificate of Compliance, #7 Certificate of Service)(Bickerton, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 Scheduling Conference Statement . (McHenry, Patricia)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Bank of America, N.A. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Submission of Certified Copies of Exhibits C and D Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Patricia J. McHenry, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D-1, #4 Exhibit D-2, #5 Certificate of Service)(McHenry, Patricia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #9 Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint:Motion Hearing is set for 9/6/2019 at 9:30 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. (shm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Patricia J. McHenry appearing for Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Patricia J. McHenry, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Certificate of Service)(McHenry, Patricia) Modified on 6/14/2019 (emt, ).
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 9:30 a.m. IS ADVANCED TO 9:00 a.m. on the same date of 07/08/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. If not already submitted, the Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 07/01/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii; CV 19-1-0525-03 GWBC. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial; Summons, #5 Additional Claims Information Sheet, #6 First Amended Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial; Summons, #7 Return and Acknowledgment of Service as to Bank of America, N.A., #8 Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Exhibit 1; Certificate of Service, #9 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 3) to Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 3) to Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit 1 (Part 3 of 3) to Notice of Removal, #12 Certificate of Service) (emt, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/10/2019. Case reassigned to JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE for all further proceedings. JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00285 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings . (emt, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Bank of America, N.A. of Related Case Bank of America, N.A.. (McHenry, Patricia)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A... (McHenry, Patricia)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 7/8/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00285 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America, N.A. from First Circuit Court, case number 19-1-0525-03 GWBC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2212905), filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Patricia J. McHenry, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Certificate of Service)(McHenry, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apilado v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro G. Dela Cruz
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Makenna
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris A. Rodriguez
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah R. Vallejo
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary N. Pastore
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modesto D. P. Tadiarca, Jr.
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genesis K. Willis
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall K. Jim
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan M. Julian
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward T. Nagata
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly H. K. Kaakimaka
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo C. Valencia
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon J. Gray
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Fruen
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon M. P. Apilando
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland M. Kam
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin G. K. Apilando
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charleen M. A. Tinao
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dyron B. Castulo
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter P. Marquardt
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Vallejo
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh A. Kadooka
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale E. Sims
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey S. Renteria
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Masterson
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon N. Tominaga
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romaine M. Edwards
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda A. Phillips
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin M. Jones
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois E. Robinson
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C. Pastore, Jr.
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laola T. Malaluan
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolan T. Caballero, Sr.
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filomena C. Dela Cruz
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George T. Tolmachoff
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamehalyn Y. Santos
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol E. Cobia
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean F. Willis
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason P. Malaluan
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan C. Fox
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick K. Fernandez
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joni A. Pitcher
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary F. Pitcher
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl K. Nagata
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat T. Kadooka
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madonna T. Machado
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilynn E. Tolmachoff
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia May
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia B. Valencia
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco M. Apilado
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy A. D'Ambrosio
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell R. Higgins
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Y. Tominaga
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas J. D'Ambrosio
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley D. Renteria
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Gray
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian R. Apilado
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth M. Spector
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Edwards
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald C. Beaumonte, Jr.
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darius A. Jamal
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mynor S. Roque
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie B. Drury
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nowlin P. Correa
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle K. Caballero
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria E. Masterson
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando M. Tirso
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chadwick K. Phillips, Sr.
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia R. Fruean
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Patricia J. McHenry
Represented By: Allison Mizuo Lee
Represented By: Robert A. Muckenfuss
Represented By: Elizabeth M.Z. Timmermans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?