PECA-HEW Annuity Fund, et al v. Hawaiya Technologies, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: PECA-HEW Training Fund, PECA-HEW Annuity Fund, PECA-HEW Vacation and Holiday Fund and PECA-HEW Health & Welfare Fund
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10, Hawaiya Technologies, Inc., Doe Trusts 1-10, Jane Does 1-10 and Doe Corporations 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00302
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Planning Meeting Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(f). (Peterson, Noah)
July 4, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hawaiya Technologies, Inc.. (Lee, Leighton)
July 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hawaiya Technologies, Inc..(Lee, Leighton)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 EO: Pursuant to Plaintiffs' request, and by agreement of counsel, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/19 @ 8:30 AM is CONTINUED to 8/29/2019 @ 9:15 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 8/22/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 EO: The Court RESCHEDULES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2019 @ 9:00 AM to 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PECA-HEW Training Fund, PECA-HEW Vacation and Holiday Fund, PECA-HEW Health & Welfare Fund, PECA-HEW Annuity Fund. Hawaiya Technologies, Inc.. (Peterson, Noah)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT For #3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by PECA-HEW Annuity Fund, PECA-HEW Health & Welfare Fund, PECA-HEW Training Fund, PECA-HEW Vacation and Holiday Fund PECA-HEW Annuity Fund, PECA-HEW Health & Welfare Fund, PECA-HEW Training Fund, PECA-HEW Vacation and Holiday Fund. (Peterson, Noah) Modified docket text to reflect pdf attachment as an acknowledgment in place of a notice on 6/17/2019 (cib).
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hawaiya Technologies, Inc.. (cib)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 8/12/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00302-LEK-RT on all further pleadings.(cib)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hawaiya Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2216008.), filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peterson, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PECA-HEW Annuity Fund, et al v. Hawaiya Technologies, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiya Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Leighton K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Trusts 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PECA-HEW Training Fund
Represented By: Randal S. Yoshida
Represented By: Noah Kila Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PECA-HEW Annuity Fund
Represented By: Randal S. Yoshida
Represented By: Noah Kila Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PECA-HEW Vacation and Holiday Fund
Represented By: Randal S. Yoshida
Represented By: Noah Kila Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PECA-HEW Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Randal S. Yoshida
Represented By: Noah Kila Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?