Puuohau, et al v. Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC, et al
Plaintiff: Charles K. Puuohau and Marlei M.A. Puuohau
Defendant: Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC, Association of Apartment Owners of Salt Lake Manor, Russell H. Ando and Ekimoto & Morris, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00304
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Russell H. Ando served on 7/12/2019 filed by Charles K. Puuohau, Marlei M.A. Puuohau. (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/31/2019 (cib).
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 EO: Based on Plaintiffs' counsel's request to allow sufficient time for Defendants to file a response to the Complaint, the Court CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 8/12/2019 to 10/02/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. Plaintiffs shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Association of Apartment Owners of Salt Lake Manor served on 7/8/2019 filed by Charles K. Puuohau, Marlei M.A. Puuohau. (Ho, Timothy) Modified to add service date on 7/31/2019 (cib ).
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ekimoto & Morris, LLC. served on 7/8/2019 filed by Charles K. Puuohau, Marlei M.A. Puuohau. (Ho, Timothy) Modified to add service date on 7/31/2019 (cib).
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Russell H. Ando, Association of Apartment Owners of Salt Lake Manor, Ekimoto & Morris, LLC. (Attachments: #1 issued summons Ekimoto and Morris LLC, #2 issued summons Russell H. Ando)(cib)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Salt Lake Manor, Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC, Russell H. Ando, filed by Charles K. Puuohau, Marlei M.A. Puuohau.(Ho, Timothy)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/12/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00304-LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (cib)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Charles K. Puuohau, Marlei M.A. Puuohau. (Ho, Timothy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ;DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC, Association of Apartment Owners of Salt Lake Manor ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2216292.), filed by Charles K. Puuohau, Marlei M.A. Puuohau.(Ho, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puuohau, et al v. Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Salt Lake Manor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell H. Ando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ekimoto & Morris, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles K. Puuohau
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlei M.A. Puuohau
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?