Ducworks, Inc. v. RBI-Zumwalt, JV, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ducworks, Inc.
Defendant: RBI-Zumwalt, JV, LLC, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00307
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 EO: Based on Plaintiff's counsel's request to allow additional time to serve Defendants and for the parties to discuss settlement, the Court finds good cause to CONTINUE the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 9/09/2019 to 11/12/2019 at 9:45 AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JACK W. REED re #6 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/31/2019. (emt, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Jack W. Reed Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2239811.Anna H. Oshiro appearing for Plaintiff Ducworks, Inc. (Oshiro, Anna)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00307 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2230834.), filed by Ducworks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Nordyke, Veronica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ducworks, Inc. v. RBI-Zumwalt, JV, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBI-Zumwalt, JV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ducworks, Inc.
Represented By: Veronica A Nordyke
Represented By: Jack W. Reed
Represented By: Anna H. Oshiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?