Freitas v. Healy Tibbitts Builders, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gary Freitas
Defendant: Healy Tibbitts Builders, Inc. and Weeks Marine, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00309
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 17 Scheduling Conference Statement of the Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Connell, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement of the Plaintiff. Report of Parties' 26(f) Planning Conference (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Connell, John) Docket Text Modified on 9/6/2019 (jo)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement by Healy Tibbitts Builders, Inc. and Weeks Marine, Inc.. (Nakano, Michael)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Healy Tibbitts Builders, Inc., Weeks Marine, Inc..(Nakano, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JOHN R. HILLSMAN re: #12 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 8/15/2019. JOHN R. HILLSMAN, ESQ. (Law Firm: McGuinn, Hillsman & Palefsky) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff GARY FREITAS (jo)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of John R. Hillsman Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2246617.John T. O'Connell appearing for Plaintiff Gary Freitas (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Connell, John)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Freitas. Weeks Marine, Inc. served on 8/5/2019. (O'Connell, John) Docket Text Modified on 8/9/2019 (jo)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Freitas. Healy Tibbitts Builders, Inc. served on 8/5/2019. (O'Connell, John) Docket Text Modified on 8/9/2019 (jo)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (O'Connell, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Defendant Weeks Marine, Inc. (jo)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Defendant Healy Tibbitts Builders, Inc. (jo)
July 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons (Proposed) (O'Connell, John)
July 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (O'Connell, John)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 9/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00309 ACK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2230921.), filed by Gary Freitas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Connell, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freitas v. Healy Tibbitts Builders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Freitas
Represented By: John T. O'Connell
Represented By: John R. Hillsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healy Tibbitts Builders, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Nakano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weeks Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Nakano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?