Viernes v. DNF Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Ronald Viernes
Defendant: DNF Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00316
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff. (Brackett, Justin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 08/19/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 08/29/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 08/22/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Planning Meeting Rule 26f Conference Held. (Brackett, Justin)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BRENDAN H. LITTLE re: #10 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 7/24/2019. BRENDAN H. LITTLE, ESQ. (Law Firm: Lippes Mathias Wexler Friedman LLP) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Defendant DNF Associates, LLC (jo)
July 17, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY: Please be advised docket number #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re Brendan H. Little contains an Order for Judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the Proposed Order to the applicable chambers' email address. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations and LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (jo)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re Brendan H. Little Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2232786.Andrew James Lautenbach appearing for Defendant DNF Associates, LLC (Lautenbach, Andrew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DNF Associates, LLC. (Lautenbach, Andrew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by DNF Associates, LLC.(Lautenbach, Andrew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Viernes. Defendant DNF Associates, LLC served on 6/24/2019. (Brackett, Justin) Docket Text Modified on 6/28/2019 (jo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendant DNF Associates, LLC (jo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 8/19/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00316 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, EXHIBITS A THROUGH B, and VERIFICATION against DNF Associates, LLC (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #0975-2219832.), filed by Ronald Viernes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration Verification of Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brackett, Justin) Docket Text Modified on 6/19/2019 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viernes v. DNF Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNF Associates, LLC
Represented By: Brendan H. Little
Represented By: Andrew James Lautenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Viernes
Represented By: Justin A. Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?