Hawaii Tapers' Trust Funds, et al v. Leite, Jr.
Plaintiff: Hawaii Tapers' Trust Funds, Hawaii Tapers Health & Welfare Trust Fund, District Counsil 50 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund Trust Fund, Hawaii Market Recovery Fund, Hawaii Tapers Retiree Health Reimbursement Fund, Hawaii Tapers Annuity Trust Fund and Hawaii Tapers Vacation Fund
Defendant: Reginald S. Leite, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00334
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 EO: The Court GRANTS IN PART #8 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for First Extension of Time to Serve Complaint. Based on the Ex Parte Motion, the Court finds that Plaintiffs have established good cause to extend the time to serve for an additional 60 days. The time to serve is extended from September 26, 2019, up to and including November 25, 2019. To allow time for service, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2019 is CONTINUED to 12/9/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. Plaintiffs shall notify Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
August 23, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY: Please be advised docket entry #8 Ex Parte Motion for First Extension of Time to Serve Complaint filed by Hawaii Tapers Health & Welfare Trust Fund requires the Judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in word format to the applicable chambers email address. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations and LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (jo)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 EX PARTE Motion Ex Parte Motion for First Extension of Time to Serve Complaint Jerry P.S. Chang appearing for Plaintiff Hawaii Tapers Health & Welfare Trust Fund (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jerry P.S. Chang, #2 Declaration or Ira Hookano, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 [Proposed] Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for First Extension of Time to Serve Complaint)(Chang, Jerry)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 08/26/2019 is CONTINUED to 10/4/2019 at 09:30AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall notify Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Reginald S. Leite, Jr.. (cib)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/26/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00334-ACK-WRP on all further pleadings. (cib)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by All Plaintiffs (Ikeda, Ashley) Modified docket text on 6/28/2019 (cib).
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2224684.), filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley) Modified docket text on 6/28/2019 (cib).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawaii Tapers' Trust Funds, et al v. Leite, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Tapers' Trust Funds
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Tapers Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Counsil 50 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Market Recovery Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Tapers Retiree Health Reimbursement Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Tapers Annuity Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Tapers Vacation Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald S. Leite, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?