Lo v. China Airlines, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Chu Shu Lo
Defendant: Hung Chang Chou, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Entities 1-10 and China Airlines
Case Number: 1:2019cv00335
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 7/30/2019. (emt, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates are given. Court to prepare a Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 07/28/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kupono before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 06/16/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 07/17/2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Aha Kupono before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Early Settlement Conference is set for 10/02/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 04/20/2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 02/26/2020. Discovery due by 05/29/2020. (FTR-Ctrm C6 9:02 - 9:05.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 9:30 a.m. IS ADVANCED TO 9:00 a.m. on the same date of 07/29/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement and Certificate of Service. (Amaguin, Roman)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Scheduling Conference Statement by Defendant China Airlines; Certificate of Service. (Petrus, Barbara)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Rule 26(F) Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting; Certificate of Service. (Petrus, Barbara)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant China Airlines' ANSWER to Complaint Filed on February 25, 2019 by China Airlines.(Petrus, Barbara)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii; CV 19-1-0295-02 GWBC. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Jury Demand; Summons, #5 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Exhibit 1; Certificate of Service) (emt, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by China Airlines. (Petrus, Barbara)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 7/29/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00335 HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hung Chang Chou, China Airlines, Ltd. from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 19-1-0295-02., filed by Hung Chang Chou, China Airlines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service)(Petrus, Barbara) Modified on 6/28/2019: receipt # 0975-2224819$ 400.00. (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lo v. China Airlines, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chu Shu Lo
Represented By: Roman F. Amaguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hung Chang Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Airlines
Represented By: Andrew K. Recktenwald
Represented By: Barbara A. Petrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?