Akana, et al v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: Gabrielle A. Kahae, Margaret M. Phillips, Irene L. Yoakum, Diane S. Siangco, Robert G. Straub, Sr., Bruce M. Yoakum, William L. Staley, Grace F. Akana, John J. Phillips, III, Mark A. Phillips, Steven K.P. Kahae, Siennaa L. Martin, Holly M. Phillips and Siennna L. Martin
Defendant: Janis Lynn Martinez, County of Maui, American Financial Network, Inc., Sarah A. Nicole Santos, Herman Morris Enterprises, Inc., V.I.P. Mortgage, Inc., Linda Meshell, Terrence J. Maier, Michael P. Werner, Hugh Meshell, Doe Defendants 1-50, Security National Mortgage Company, Camila Wai, Maui Life, Happy Wife, LLC, Barbara M. Swanson, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Keith A. Watimar, Curtis H. Takamiiya, Jason J. Santos, Karen G. Maier, First Hawaiian Bank, Heather J. Werner, Bank of America, N.A., Central Pacific Home Loans, Inc., Charles K. Wai, Jr. and Curtis H. Takamiya
Case Number: 1:2019cv00342
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 23 EO: In light of the Court's Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Order of Remand in Apilado v. Bank of America, Civil No. 19-00285 JAO-KJM, and the Court's remand orders in Azad v. PNC Bank, Civil No. 19-00035 JAO-KJM and Copeland v. PNC Bank, Civil No. 19-00029 JAO-WRP, BANA is directed to submit a response by 8/30/19, not to exceed three (3) pages, indicating whether it maintains its position with respect to the viability of its bases for removal. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 EP: EARLY GLOBAL SETTLEMENT held. The Court met with the parties. Settlement discussions held.No settlement reached at this time.Parties may contact Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield's courtroom Manager, Bernie Aurio at (808) 541-1298, if they so wish further assistance in settlement with the Court. (KJM Chambers 9:00 - 10:45.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ELIZABETH M. Z. TIMMERMANS re #18 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/15/2019. (emt, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING AMENDED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ROBERT A. MUCKENFUSS re #17 , #19 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/15/2019. (emt, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Robert A. Muckenfuss Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2246454. Patricia J. McHenry appearing for Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (McHenry, Patricia)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth M.Z. Timmermans Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2246466.Patricia J. McHenry appearing for Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth M.Z. Timmermans, #2 Exhibit A)(McHenry, Patricia)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Robert A. Muckenfuss Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2246454.Patricia J. McHenry appearing for Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Muckenfuss, #2 Exhibit A)(McHenry, Patricia)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 At parties request, an Early Global Settlement Conference is set for 08/21/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference Statements are due by 08/14/2019 and shall be emailed to mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.govRelated cases: Akana, Case No. 19-342 JAO-WRP;Apilado, Case No. 19-285 JAO-KJM; Benge, Case No. 19-349 JMS-KJM;Boyd, Case No. 19-353 LEK-KJM;Camat, Case No. 19-340 JAO-WRP;Ege, Case No. 19-351 LEK-KJM;Kumuhone, Case No. 19-348 JMS-KJM;Llanes, Case No. 19-356 DKW-WRP;Mattison, Case No. 19-354 JMS-WRP;McCullough, Case No. 19-350 JMS-WRP;DeGamo, Case No. 13-141 JAO-KJM. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #13 Motion for Order of Remand:Motion Hearing is set for 10/1/2019 at 9:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Opposition Memorandum is due 8/30/2019. Reply Memorandum is due 9/6/2019.(shm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 EO: In light of the pending motion to remand, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 10/7/2019 at 9:30AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand James J. Bickerton appearing for Plaintiffs Grace F. Akana, Gabrielle A. Kahae, Steven K.P. Kahae, Siennna L. Martin, Holly M. Phillips, Margaret M. Phillips, Mark A. Phillips, John J. Phillips, III, Diane S. Siangco, William L. Staley, Robert G. Straub, Sr., Bruce M. Yoakum, Irene L. Yoakum (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of James J. Bickerton, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Certificate of Compliance, #11 Certificate of Service)(Bickerton, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Siennna L. Martin, Holly M. Phillips, Grace F. Akana, Gabrielle A. Kahae, Bruce M. Yoakum, Margaret M. Phillips, Diane S. Siangco, John J. Phillips, III, William L. Staley, Mark A. Phillips, Steven K.P. Kahae, Robert G. Straub, Sr., Irene L. Yoakum. Bank of America, N.A. served on 7/9/2019 . (Bickerton, James) Modified on 7/11/2019 (emt, ).
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 [AMENDED COMPLAINT] - JOINT AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION re #1 against All Plaintiffs, filed by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allison Mizuo Lee, #2 Exhibit 1 (Complaint) , #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Allison) Modified on 7/10/2019 (emt, ).
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A. (emt, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Summons (Proposed) (Bickerton, James)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to COMPLAINT, FILED EX OFFICIO APRIL 12, 2019, FILED JUNE 28, 2019 by V.I.P. Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Price, Charles)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 08/05/2019 is CONTINUED to 8/15/2019 at 09:15AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Bank of America, N.A.. (Lee, Allison)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 8/5/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00342-JAO-WRP on all further pleadings. (cib)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Bank of America, N.A. , Notice of Related Case. Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Allison)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Allison)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America, N.A. from Second Circuit Court, case number Civ. No. 19-1-0135-02. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2225964), filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allison Mizuo Lee, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M - STATE COURT COMPLAINT #15 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Allison) Modified on 7/2/2019 (cib).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akana, et al v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle A. Kahae
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret M. Phillips
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene L. Yoakum
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane S. Siangco
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G. Straub, Sr.
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce M. Yoakum
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Staley
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace F. Akana
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Phillips, III
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Phillips
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven K.P. Kahae
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siennaa L. Martin
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly M. Phillips
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siennna L. Martin
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janis Lynn Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Maui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Financial Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah A. Nicole Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Morris Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V.I.P. Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Meshell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence J. Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Meshell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security National Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camila Wai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maui Life, Happy Wife, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara M. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Mizuo Lee
Represented By: Patricia J. McHenry
Represented By: Robert A. Muckenfuss
Represented By: Elizabeth M.Z. Timmermans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith A. Watimar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis H. Takamiiya
Represented By: Charles A. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason J. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen G. Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Hawaiian Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather J. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Allison Mizuo Lee
Represented By: Patricia J. McHenry
Represented By: Robert A. Muckenfuss
Represented By: Elizabeth M.Z. Timmermans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Pacific Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles K. Wai, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis H. Takamiya
Represented By: Charles A. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?