Moore v. Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon
Plaintiff: Nina M. Moore and Bradon K. Moore
Defendant: Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP, Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon and Kapono F.H. Kiakona
Case Number: 1:2019cv00363
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Christine S. Madriaga on behalf of Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP on behalf of Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Madriaga, Jamie Christine)
September 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Duane R. Miyashiro on behalf of Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP on behalf of Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (Miyashiro, Duane) Modified on 9/6/2019 Note: Document refiled as ECF No. #19 Notice of Appearance of Counsel (emt, ).
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 EO: Pursuant to Plaintiffs' request, and by agreement of counsel, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 10/8/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 10/1/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kapono F.H. Kiakona, Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (Miyashiro, Duane)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Filed July 9, 2019 by Kapono F.H. Kiakona, Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP.(Miyashiro, Duane)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bradon K. Moore, Nina M. Moore. Kapono F.H. Kiakona served on 7/24/2019 . (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/26/2019 (emt, ).
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bradon K. Moore, Nina M. Moore. Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP served on 7/24/2019 . (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/26/2019 (emt, ).
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bradon K. Moore, Nina M. Moore. Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon served 7/19/2019 . (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/24/2019 (emt, ).
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. (emt, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Kapono F.H. Kiakona. (emt, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon. (emt, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00363 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Bradon K. Moore. (Ho, Timothy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2229049.), filed by Bradon K. Moore.(Ho, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP
Represented By: Duane R. Miyashiro
Represented By: Jamie Christine S. Madriaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kapono F.H. Kiakona
Represented By: Duane R. Miyashiro
Represented By: Jamie Christine S. Madriaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina M. Moore
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradon K. Moore
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?