Kuewa, et al. v. Association of Apartment Owners of Mililani Town Houses, et al.
Plaintiff: Alexander K. Kuewa and Donna A. Kuewa
Defendant: Arlette S. Harada, Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC and Association of Apartment Owners of Mililani Town Houses
Case Number: 1:2019cv00367
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Association of Apartment Owners of Mililani Town Houses. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Oyasato, Dan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander K. Kuewa, Donna A. Kuewa. Association of Apartment Owners of Mililani Town Houses served on 7/19/2019 . (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/24/2019 (emt, ).
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander K. Kuewa, Donna A. Kuewa. Arlette S. Harada 7/19/2019 . (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/24/2019 (emt, ).
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander K. Kuewa, Donna A. Kuewa. Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC 7/19/2019 . (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/24/2019 (emt, ).
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Mililani Town Houses, Arlette S. Harada, Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC, (Attachments: #1 issued summons Arlette S. Harada, #2 issued summons Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC)(cib)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 9/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00367-HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Alexander K. Kuewa, Donna A. Kuewa. (Ho, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2229742.), filed by Alexander K. Kuewa, Donna A. Kuewa (Ho, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuewa, et al. v. Association of Apartment Owners of Mililani Town Houses, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlette S. Harada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Mililani Town Houses
Represented By: Dan C. Oyasato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander K. Kuewa
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna A. Kuewa
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?