Heu, Jr., et al. v. Association of Apartment Owners of Rainbow Series-Kuola, et al.
Plaintiff: Shawna W. Kawasaki and Daniel F. Heu, Jr.
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Rainbow Series-Kuola, Arlette S. Harada and Ekimoto & Morris, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00369
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 EO: In light of the #13 Stipulation To Stay Proceedings, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 09/09/2019 IS VACATED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 EO: On August 26, 2019, the court approved the parties' Stipulation To Stay Proceedings. ECF No. #13 . Thus, this court ORDERS that the case be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending a decision by the Hawaii Supreme Court in Malabe v. AOAO of Executive Centre, SCWC-17-0000145, or upon request by the parties. See, e.g., Penn West Assocs., Inc. v. Cohen, 371 F.3d 118, 127, 128 (3d Cir. 2004) (explaining that administrative closings "comprise a familiar, albeit essentially ad hoc, way in which courts remove cases from their active files without making any final adjudication" and are "an administrative convenience which allows the removal of cases from the [docket] in appropriate situations") (citations omitted). The administrative closing of this case is solely an administrative matter and does not impact, in any manner, any party's rights or obligations, does not alter in any manner any previous rulings by the court, and does not require a filing fee to reopen the case. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/26/2019. (jo)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel F. Heu, Jr, Shawna W. Kawasaki. Association of Apartment Owners of Rainbow Series-Kuola served on 7/25/2019 through Albert J. Pattison. (Ho, Timothy) Docket Text Modified on 7/30/2019 (jo)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel F. Heu, Jr, Shawna W. Kawasaki. Ekimoto & Morris, LLC served on 7/24/2019 through John A. Morris. (Ho, Timothy) Docket Text Modified on 7/30/2019 (jo)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel F. Heu, Jr, Shawna W. Kawasaki. Arlette S. Harada served on 7/24/2019. (Ho, Timothy) Docket Text Modified on 7/30/2019 (jo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Rainbow Series-Kuola, Arlette S. Harada, Ekimoto & Morris, LLC (Attachments: #1 issued summons Arlette S. Harada, #2 issued summons Ekimoto & Morris, LLC)(cib)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 9/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00369-JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Daniel F. Heu, Jr., Shawna W. Kawasaki (Ho, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2230148.), filed by Daniel F. Heu, Jr., Shawna W. Kawasaki.(Ho, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heu, Jr., et al. v. Association of Apartment Owners of Rainbow Series-Kuola, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Rainbow Series-Kuola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlette S. Harada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ekimoto & Morris, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna W. Kawasaki
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel F. Heu, Jr.
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?