Song & Marshall Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Royal Gate Automotive Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yong Song and Song & Marshall Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Royal Gate Dodge Chrysler Jeep of Columbia, Inc. and Royal Gate Automotive Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00370
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Yong Song, Song & Marshall Enterprises, Inc. Notice of Continuance of Scheduling Conference Yong Song, Song & Marshall Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Utzurrum, Jose)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 EO: Because no Defendants have appeared in this action, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 9/9/2019 to 10/29/2019 at 9:45AM in the Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Plaintiffs shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yong Song, Song & Marshall Enterprises, Inc.. (Utzurrum, Jose)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by Song & Marshall Enterprises, Inc., Yong Song.(Utzurrum, Jose) Modified docket text to add demand for jury trial on 7/19/2019 (cib).
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00370 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Yong Song, Song & Marshall Enterprises, Inc.. (Utzurrum, Jose)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by Song & Marshall Enterprises, Inc., Yong Song.(Utzurrum, Jose) Modified on 7/11/2019: receipt # 0975-2230161$ 400.00 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Song & Marshall Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Royal Gate Automotive Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yong Song
Represented By: Jose Utzurrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Song & Marshall Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jose Utzurrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Gate Dodge Chrysler Jeep of Columbia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Gate Automotive Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?