Coleman v. Association of Apartment Owners of Palehua Hale
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Coleman and Penny Powell-Coleman
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Palehua Hale, Ekimoto & Morris, LLC and Arlette S. Harada
Case Number: 1:2019cv00371
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION To Stay Proceedings; ORDER. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for October 15, 2019 is VACATED and will be reset after the stay is lifted. No later than March 2, 2020 the parties shall file a Joint Status Report with the Court regarding the status of Malabe v. AOAO of Executive Centre, SCWC-17-0000145 in the Hawaii Supreme Court. Signed by MAGISTRATE WES REBER PORTER. (cib)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 10/15/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Association of Apartment Owners of Palehua Hale served on 7/24/2019 filed by Timothy L. Coleman, Penny Powell-Coleman. Association of Apartment Owners of Palehua Hale. (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/30/2019 to add service date (cib).
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Arlette S. Harada served on 7/24/2019 filed by Timothy L. Coleman, Penny Powell-Coleman. . (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/30/2019 to add service date (cib).
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ekimoto & Morris, LLC. served on 7/24/2019 filed by Timothy L. Coleman, Penny Powell-Coleman. (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/30/2019 to add service date (cib).
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ekimoto & Morris, LLC. (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Arlette S. Harada. (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Palehua Hale. (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00371 SOM-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Timothy L. Coleman. (Ho, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Palehua Hale ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2230248.), filed by Timothy L. Coleman.(Ho, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Association of Apartment Owners of Palehua Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Palehua Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ekimoto & Morris, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlette S. Harada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Coleman
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Powell-Coleman
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?