Tin v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Tin
Defendant: Walmart Inc. and Doe Defendants 1-25
Case Number: 1:2019cv00378
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service on Subpoena: Custodian of Records EAH Housing was served on 9/5/2019 (jo)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 8/14/2019. (jo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 EO: re #10 MINUTES, 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosure deadline is amended to February 18, 2020. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(mrf)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 8/14/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 8/18/2020 in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/7/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Early Settlement Conference is set for 2/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference statements by 2/05/2020. Settlement Conference is set for 4/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference statements 4/22/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/18/2020. Discovery due by 6/19/2020. (Court Reporter C5 - not reported. 9:17 a.m. - 9:22 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(mrf)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Inc. (First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff) (Lezy, Normand)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiff Thomas A. Tin's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hempey, Daniel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Lezy, Normand)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Scheduling Conference Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Lezy, Normand)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Keith Mackintosh on behalf of Thomas A. Tin on behalf of Thomas A. Tin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mackintosh, Brian)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 EO: The Court continues the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/19 @ 9:00 AM to 8/14/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 8/7/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 8/12/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00378 JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. from Fifth Circuit Court, case number 19-1-0087. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2231517), filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lezy, Normand)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tin v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Tin
Represented By: Daniel G. Hempey
Represented By: Brian Keith Mackintosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Nakano
Represented By: Normand R. Lezy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?