N.K. Collins, LLC v. William Grant & Sons, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: N.K. Collins, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-10, William Grant & Sons Limited and William Grant & Sons, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00386
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED DOCUMENT by N.K. Collins, LLC. Amendment to #15 Certificate of Service Re: First Request for Production of Documents to Defendants William Grant & Sons, Inc. and William Grant & Sons, Ltd.. (Fenton, Amalia)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by N.K. Collins, LLC re: First Request for Production of Documents to Defendants William Grant & Sons, Inc. and William Grant & Sons, Ltd. (Fenton, Amalia)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 8/26/2019. (jo)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - Discussion had re: status of this case.Jury Selection/Trial is set for 9/9/20 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Kay.A Status Conference is set for 11/13/19 @ 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader.Court to issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 9/9/2020 before JUDGE ALAN C. KAY. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/28/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 6/9/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Status Conference is set for 11/13/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 4/8/2020. Discovery due by 7/10/2020. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS re: ECF #11 by William Grant & Sons Limited, William Grant & Sons, Inc. Defendants/Counterclaimants William Grant & Sons, Inc.'s and William Grant & Sons Limited's Notice of Constitutional Challenge of Statute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - July 26, 2019 Letter to State of Hawaii Attorney General Claire E. Connors, Esq., #2 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William) Docket Text Modified on 8/26/2019 (jo)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by William Grant & Sons Limited, William Grant & Sons, Inc. Defendants/Counterclaimants William Grant & Sons, Inc.'s and William Grant & Sons Limited's Notice of Constitutional Challenge of Statute William Grant & Sons Limited, William Grant & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William M. Hastad, #2 Exhibit 1 - July 26, 2019 Letter to State of Hawaii Attorney General Claire E. Connors, Esq.)(Harstad, William)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT re #7 Report of Planning Meeting by William Grant & Sons Limited, William Grant & Sons, Inc. Defendants/Counterclaimants William Grant & Sons, Inc.'s and William Grant & Sons Limited's Supplement to Plaintiff's Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting, Filed August 19, 2019 [Doc No. 7]. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendants/Counterclaimants William Grant & Sons, Inc.'s and William Grant & Sons Limited's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Winter, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Winter, Matthew)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 CLAIM Answer to Counterclaims by N.K. Collins, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Winter, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii; CV 19-1-0925-06 DEO (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint, #5 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion For Leave to Take Deposition Upon Oral Examination to Perpetuate Testimony, #6 Defendants William Grant & Sons, Inc. and William Grant & Sons Limited's Answer to Complaint, #7 Defendants William Grant & Sons, Inc. and William Grant & Sons Limited's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (jo)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by William Grant & Sons Limited, William Grant & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 8/26/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00386 ACK-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by William Grant & Sons Limited, William Grant & Sons, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2235234), filed by William Grant & Sons Limited, William Grant & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William M. Harstad, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Take Deposition Upon Oral Examination, #4 Exhibit 3 - Defendants' Answer and Counterclaim, #5 Exhibit 4 - Hoohiki Docket for the State Court Action, #6 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's Articles of Organization, #7 Exhibit 6 - Amendment to Petition for Determination of Heirs, filed June 26, 2018, #8 Exhibit 7 - Davis Levin Livingston press release, #9 Exhibit 8 - Printout of a page from the website of Davis Levin Livingston, #10 Exhibit 9 - June 28, 2019 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel to Defendants, #11 Declaration of Jonathan Yusen, #12 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.K. Collins, LLC v. William Grant & Sons, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Grant & Sons Limited
Represented By: William M. Harstad
Represented By: Steven M. Egesdal
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Grant & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Harstad
Represented By: Steven M. Egesdal
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.K. Collins, LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Davis
Represented By: Thomas M. Otake
Represented By: Matthew C. Winter
Represented By: William G. Meyer, III
Represented By: Amalia L. Fenton
Represented By: Michael K. Livingston
Represented By: Julia Kimie Brotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?