Pizl vs. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Michal Pizl
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00397
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 EO: Defendant's counsel John-Anderson Meyer informs the Court that they have filed a Motion to Transfer with the Multi District Litigation (MDL) Court, Northern District of California and that a hearing of December 5, 2019 has been set. Therefore, jointly request that the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference be continued. Request is GRANTED. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 09/23/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 12/17/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 12/10/2019. Mr. John-Anderson Meyer to notify Plaintiffs counsel. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Meyer, John-Anderson)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant Monsanto Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Meyer, John-Anderson)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michal Pizl. Defendant Monsanto Company served on 8/7/2019 through Rhonda Velardo of CSC. (jo)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 9/23/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (emt, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00397 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Mackintosh, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Sherin McClure, Michal Pizl. (Mackintosh, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2236805.), filed by Michal Pizl, Sherin McClure. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(Mackintosh, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pizl vs. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michal Pizl
Represented By: Brian Keith Mackintosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: John-Anderson L. Meyer
Represented By: Paul Alston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?