Chang v. Crane Company; et al.
Plaintiff: Karen S Chang, as Successor Trustee of the James S. Kimoto Self-Trusteed Trust and Karen S. Chang
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Ingersoll Rand Co., Flowserve US Inc., crane co., Crane Company and Does 1 to 25
Not Yet Classified: Keith Hunter
Case Number: 1:2019cv00400
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 Defendant Crane Co.'s Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed September 5, 2019 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM Cross-Claim Against All Other Defendants against Ingersoll Rand Co. by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against All Other Defendants, #2 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
September 5, 2019 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Karen S. Chang. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Segawa, Alyssa) Docket text modified on 9/6/2019 (emt, ).
September 3, 2019 Filing 20 EO: Based on the lack of opposition and finding good cause in support thereof, the Court GRANTS #12 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than 9/9/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, Defendant Crane Co.'s Answer to Ingersoll-Rand Co.'s Cross-Claims Against Other Defendants by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 8/26/2019. Discussion held. Parties informed the Court that there is currently no mediation date set. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUTED to 12/4/2019 at 09:00AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. A Joint Status Report is due no later than 11/27/2019. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:00 a.m. - 9:15 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Co.'s Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Crane Co.'s Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fujita, Allison)
August 12, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #14 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR shall be served by First Class Mail to Keith Hunter, Esq., at Dispute Prevention & Resolution, Inc., 1003 Bishop St Ste 1155, Honolulu, Hi 96813 on August 13, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/12/2019. Keith Hunter added as mediator. (emt, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 EO: Pursuant to Rule 7.2(d) of the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii, the Court elects to decide #12 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint without a hearing. Briefing shall be in accordance with Local Rule 7.4. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Alyssa R Segawa appearing for Plaintiff Karen S. Chang (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(Segawa, Alyssa)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 [REPORT of Planning Meeting] (Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter from L. Richard DeRobertis, Esq., dated August 6, 2019 Re: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for August 26, 2019) . (DeRobertis, L.) Docket text modified on 8/7/2019 (emt, ).
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Ingersoll Rand Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll Rand Co. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll Rand Co... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Crane Company by Ingersoll Rand Co.. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against Other Defendants, #2 Answer to Cross-Claim Asserted by All Other Defendants Against Ingersoll-Rand Co., #3 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint Filed April 23, 2019, CROSSCLAIM against Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Flowserve US Inc., Ingersoll Rand Co. by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against All Other Defendants, #2 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, CV 19-1-0643-04 JHA. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Exhibit A; Summons, #5 Request to Exempt Case from Court Annexed Arbitration Program; Summary of Facts, #6 Arbitration Administrator's Decision Granting Request to Exempt Case from Court Annexed Arbitration Program, #7 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal; Exhibit "A"; Certificate of Service, #8 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 13) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 13 ) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 13 ) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (emt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #11 Exhibit A (Part 4 of 13) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit A (Part 5 of 13 ) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #13 Exhibit A (Part 6 of 13) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (emt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #14 Exhibit A (Part 7 of 13) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #15 Exhibit A (Part 8 of 13) Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #16 Exhibit A (Part 9 of 13 ) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #17 Exhibit A (Part 10 of 13) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #18 Exhibit A (Part 11 of 13 ) to Notice Filing Notice of Removal, #19 Exhibit A (Part 12 of 13) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #20 Exhibit A (Part 13 of 13) to Notice of Filng Notice of Removal, #21 Certificate of Service) (emt, ).
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/26/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00400 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by crane co. by crane co. Additional Exhibits To Defendant Crane Co.S Notice Of Removal [ECF 1]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3d - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. R, T, U, #2 Exhibit 4a - Forman Affidavit, Ex. A, A-5, A-7, #3 Exhibit 4b - Forman,Samuel.Affidavit. Ex. A-16, A-19, A-24, A-26, A-27, #4 Exhibit 5 - Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harstad, William) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/25/2019) (apg, ).
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by crane co. by crane co. Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3a - Sargent,David.Affidavit, Ex. A, A-1, B, D, #2 Exhibit 3b - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. G, H, J, L, #3 Exhibit 3c - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. N, O, P)(Harstad, William)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by crane co. Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal from First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, case number 19-1-0643-04 JHA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2237073), filed by crane co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William M. Harstad, #2 Exhibit 1 - James S. Kimoto Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Friemoth Affidavit, Ex. A, B, C, D)(Harstad, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chang v. Crane Company; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Co.
Represented By: Christopher S. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: crane co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: William M. Harstad
Represented By: Derek B Simon
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen S Chang, as Successor Trustee of the James S. Kimoto Self-Trusteed Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen S. Chang
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Represented By: Allison Mina Aoki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Keith Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?