Wicked Nevada, LLC v. John Doe; et al.
Plaintiff: Wicked Nevada, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, Does 1-16, Techmodo Limited and Senthil Vijay Segaran
Case Number: 1:2019cv00413
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wicked Nevada, LLC. Senthil Vijay Segaran served on 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Fergus Carson-Williams)(Culpepper, Kerry) Docket Text Modified on 9/27/2019 (jo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wicked Nevada, LLC. Techmodo Limited served on 9/4/2019. (Culpepper, Kerry) Docket Text Modified on 9/27/2019 (jo)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Kerry S. Culpepper on behalf of Wicked Nevada, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 EO: In light of the 12 ORDER granting 11 Ex Parte Motion, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 09/30/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 01/08/2020 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 01/02/2020. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Ex Parte Motion: The Court has reviewed and considered Plaintiff Wicked Nevada, LLC's First Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint and Summons ("Motion"), filed August 21, 2019. See ECF No. 11. Finding good cause shown in the Motion, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Plaintiff shall serve the Defendants in this case by January 28, 2020. The Court will issue a new Rule 16 scheduling conference date, continuing the September 30, 2019 Scheduling Conference for at least 90 days.Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 08/29/2019. (mansfield1)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 EX PARTE PLAINTIFFS FIRST MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff Wicked Nevada, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel)(Culpepper, Kerry)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to John Doe. (cib)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Culpepper, Kerry)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 EX PARTE Motion PLAINTIFFS SECOND EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff Wicked Nevada, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum support of motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration of Counsel)(Culpepper, Kerry)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE Motion PLAINTIFFS FIRST EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff Wicked Nevada, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum re Motion)(Culpepper, Kerry)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 9/30/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00413 SOM-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Wicked Nevada, LLC Wicked Nevada, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry) Docket text modified on 8/1/2019 (emt, ).
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wicked Nevada, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Voltage Productions, LLC for Wicked Nevada, LLC.. (Culpepper, Kerry)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for (1) CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (2) INTENTIONAL INDUCEMENT and (3) DIRECT COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT against DOE, JOHN DOE dba YTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2241002.), filed by Wicked Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Declaration of Stephanie Kessner, #6 Declaration of Benny Ng, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culpepper, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wicked Nevada, LLC v. John Doe; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techmodo Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senthil Vijay Segaran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wicked Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?