Keliihuluhulu: v. Keanaaina et al
Plaintiff: Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu:
Defendant: Jean Keka, Richard Ramirez, Master Falau, Maasi Teutau, Robert D. Triantos, Michelle C. Dickinson, Deanna S. Sako, Fine Teutau, Tupou VI, Renee Sonobe Hong, Sione Filikitonga, Harry Kim, Paul Ferriera, Doe Defendants 1-10000, Maaki Teutau, Leroy E. Colombe, Tyler Meno, Semisi Fonua, Norman A. Keanaaina, Asa Teutau, Samuela Tatofi, Patrick Kawai, Salesi He-i-liku Tonga, Maaki Teatau and Leroy Colombe
Intervenor Plaintiff: Leitu Ramirez, Felise Auaea, Julia Kamanawa-Kala, Lorna Pikake Spinney, Tina Wilson, John Apele Kaluau, III and Cynthia Kamanawa-Cisneros
Case Number: 1:2019cv00417
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
2 Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 45 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re ECF Nos. 44 ). Mail sent to Lorna Pikake Spinney, Tina Wilson, Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu, Felise Auaea, and John Apele Kaluau, III c/o Kapaiki PSN*990, Kalaloa 4 Kona Mokupuni Hawaii" returned undeliverable, "no such street, unable to forward". (apg, )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE JOHN APELE KALUAU III'S APPLICATION TO INTERVENE re #37 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 9/26/2019. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu, Tina Wilson, Cynthia Kamanawa-Cisneros, Julia Kamanawa-Kala, Felise Auaea, Leitu Ramirez, Lorna Pikake Spinney and John Apele Kaluau III shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on September 26, 2019.
September 23, 2019 Filing 43 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re ECF Nos. #28 , #29 , #30 , #31 , #32 ). Mail sent to "Lorna Pikake Spinney, et al. c/o Kapaiki PSN*990, Kalaloa 4 Kona Mokupuni Hawaii" returned undeliverable, "no such street, unable to forward". (Attachments: #1 Lorna Pikake Spinney's Supplement and Verification, filed September 13, 2019, #2 Tina Wilson's Application to Intervene, filed September 13, 2019, #3 Julia Kamanawa-Kala's Application to Intervene, filed September 13, 2019, #4 Cynthia Kamanawa-Cisneros' Application to Intervene, filed September 13, 2019, #5 Leitu Ramirez's Supplemental Affidavit, filed September 13, 2019) (emt, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 42 Transmittal Letter from H. Keliikoa re "2nd attempt to mail RETURN PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS IN CIVIL NO. CV 19-00417 LEK WRP 1st attempt made by USPS first class mail sent September 7, 2019" re #38 , #39 , #40 , #41 . (emt, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu. Paul Ferriera served on 8/7/2019 through Maj. R. Wagner. (emt, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu:. Harry Kim served on 8/9/2019 through D. Kaena Horowitz. (emt, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu. Deanna S. Sako served on 8/7/2019. (emt, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu. Patrick Kawai served on 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 37 APPLICATION to Intervene - by Intervenor Plaintiff John Apele Kaluau, III. (Attachments: #1 Verfication of and by John Apele Kaluau III, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 35 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter is taken off calendar and will be rescheduled after Plaintiff's second amended complaint is screened and properly served on Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 19, 2019 Filing 36 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ( re #27 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S PETITION IN THE NATURE OF A MOTION TO FILE ELECTRONIC FILING ECF). Mail sent to Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu at 990, Kalaoa 4, Kona, Mokupuni, HI returned undeliverable. (emt, )
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S PENDING MOTIONS AND APPLICATIONS re #2 , #3 , #5 , #25 , #30 , #31 , #32 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 9/17/2019. On the basis of the foregoing, Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, filed August 5, 2019, is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file his second amended complaint by October 17, 2019. The second amended complaint must comply with the terms of this Order. Further, Plaintiff's TRO Motion, filed August 5, 2019; Felise Auaea's Application to Intervene, filed August 2, 2019; Leitu Ramirez's Application to Intervene, filed August 2, 2019, as supplemented on September 13, 2019; Lorna Pikake Spinney's Application to Intervene, filed September 3, 2019, as supplemented on September 13, 2019; Tina Wilson's Application to Intervene, filed September 13, 2019; Cynthia Kamanawa-Cisneros's Application to Intervene, filed September 13, 2019; and Julia Kamanawa-Kala's Application to Intervene, filed September 13, 2019, are HEREBY DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The TRO Motion and the Applications may be refiled after Plaintiff files his second amended complaint. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu, Tina Wilson, Cynthia Kamanawa-Cisneros, Julia Kamanawa-Kala, Felise Auaea, Leitu Ramirez and Lorna Pikake Spinney shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on September 17, 2019.
September 16, 2019 Filing 33 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re ECF No. #25 Application to Intervene by Lorna Pikake Spinney). Mail sent to Lorna Pikake Spinney, c/o Kapaiki, PSN *990, Kalaoa 4 Kona Mokuouni Hawaii Ko Hawaii Pae Aina returned undeliverable due to insufficient address. (emt, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 32 APPLICATION to Intervene - by Intervenor Plaintiff Julia Kamanawa-Kala. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Julia Kamanawa-Kala, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit C) (emt, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 31 APPLICATION to Intervene - by Intervenor Plaintiff Cynthia Kamanawa-Cisneros. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Cynthia Kamanawa-Cisneros, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit C) (emt, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 30 APPLICATION to Intervene - by Intervenor Plaintiff Tina Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tina Wilson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit C) (emt, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT re #3 Application to Intervene - by Leitu Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Leitu Ramirez, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit C) (emt, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENT AND VERIFICATION re #25 MOTION to Intervene - by Lorna Pikake Spinney. (Attachments: #1 Verafication of and by Lorna Pikake Spinney, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit H) (emt, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S PETITION IN THE NATURE OF A MOTION TO FILE ELECTRONIC FILING ECF re #26 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 9/12/2019. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on September 12, 2019.
September 9, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #26 Motion, has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record on Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu. (ens)
September 9, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION (Petition) In The Nature Of A Motion To File Electronic Filing ECF In The U.S. District Court For The District of Hawaii; Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Mailing Documentation)(ens)
September 3, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION(Application) to Intervene; Affidavit of Lorna Pikake Spinney; Certificate of Service filed by Lorna Pikake Spinney (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lorna Pikake Spinney)(cib) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2019: #2 Mailing documentation) (cib, ).
September 3, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Richard Ramirez served on 8/10/2019 filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu. (Attachments: #1 Enclosed Letter Addressed to Clerk Regarding Return of Service, #2 Mailing Documentation) (ens)
September 3, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Maasi Teutau served on 8/10/2019 filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu. (Attachments: #1 Enclosed Letter Addressed to Clerk Regarding Return of Service, #2 Mailing Documentation) (ens)
September 3, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Maaki Teutau served on 8/10/2019 filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu. (Attachments: #1 Enclosed Letter Addressed to Clerk Regarding Return of Service, #2 Mailing Documentation)(ens)
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Fine Teutau served on 8/10/2019 filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu. (Attachments: #1 Enclosed Letter Addressed to Clerk Regarding Return of Service, #2 Mailing Documentation)(ens) Modified on 9/4/2019 to correct docket text (ens).
September 3, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jean Keka served on 8/10/2019 filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu. (Attachments: #1 Enclosed Letter Addressed to Clerk Regarding Return of Service, #2 Mailing Documentation)(ens)
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE That Appeal Is Taken In The Above Entitled Case - Notice of Genocide filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu: re #15 . (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 USCA Time Scheduling Order as to #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu:. (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 USCA Case Number 19-16580 for #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu:. (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 Filing fee: $ 505.00(PAID), receipt number HI027054 re #15 Notice of Appeal. (cib)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #8 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion for TRO, filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu:. 9CCA Case Number: 19-16580. (Attachments: #1 Appealed Document Entry #8)(cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified to add case number on 8/12/2019 (cib).
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Salesi He-i-liku Tonga served on 8/6/2019 filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu:. (cib)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Semisi Fonua served on 8/6/2019 filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu:. (cib)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Samuela Tatofi served on 8/6/2019 filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu:. (cib)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sione Filikitonga served on 8/6/2019 filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu:. (cib)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu re #7 .(Attachments: #1 returned to sender envelope) (cib) Incorrect address entered on the docket. Correct address is updated. Order of Recusal resend to plaintiff on 8/7/2019.
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Renee Sonobe Hong served on 8/5/2019 filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu: (cib)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 EO: COURT ORDER RULING ON PENDING MOTIONS. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(tl, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 6, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #7 Order of Recusal,, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu:. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 8/6/2019. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER recused. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00417-LEK-WRP on all further filings (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Leroy Colombe, Michelle C. Dickinson, Paul Ferriera, Sione Filikitonga, Semisi Fonua, Renee Sonobe Hong, Patrick Kawai, Norman A. Keanaaina, Jean Keka, Harry Kim, Tyler Meno, Richard Ramirez, Deanna S. Sako, Samuela Tatofi, Fine Teutau, Maaki Teutau, Maasi Teutau, Salesi He-i-liku Tonga, Robert D. Triantos, Tupou VI. (cib) (cib, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2019: #1 issued summons) (cib, ).
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and EMERGENCY EX-PARTE REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION Enjoining Defendants Wrongdoers from Entering Upon The Easement of Royal Patent Grant 990 To Kapaiki; Verification of and By Keliihuluhulu: Alfred Spinney; Certificate of Service against Michelle C. Dickinson, Master Falau, Sione Filikitonga, Semisi Fonua, Deanna Sako Renee Sono Hong, Patrick Kawai, Norman A. Keanaaina, Jean Keka, Harry Kim, Tyler Meno, Richard Ramirez, Samuela Tatofi, Asa Teutau, Fine Teutau, Robert D. Triantos, Tupou VI, Maasi Teutau, Leroy E. Colombe, Maaki Teutau, filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu:. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, # Exhibit F-G omitted (6) Exhibit H)(cib) Modified event type to Motion for TRO on 8/5/2019 (cib).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/30/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/2/2019. (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2019: #1 Clerk's Memo) (cib, ). ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION(Application) to Intervene; Affidavit of Leitu Ramirez; Certificate of Service filed by Leitu Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Proof A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 envelope)(cib)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION(Application) to Intervene; Affidavit of Felise Auaea; Certificate of Service filed by Felise Auaea (Attachments: #1 Proof A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 envelope)(cib)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and EMERGENCY EX-PARTE REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION Enjoining Defendants/Wrongdoers from Entering Upon the Easement of Royal Patent Grant 990 to Kapaiki against Michelle C. Dickinson, Master Falau, Sione Filikitonga, Semisi Fonua, Deanna Sako Renee Sono Hong, Patrick Kawai, Norman A. Keanaaina, Jean Keka, Harry Kim, Tyler Meno, Richard Ramirez, Deanna Sako, Samuela Tatofi, Asa Teutau, Fine Teutau, Robert D. Triantos, Tupou VI, filed by Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu: RECEIPT # HI026995. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F - Copy of CD, (Exhibit G omitted) #7 Exhibit H, #8 envelope)(cib) Modified event type to motion for TRO on 8/5/2019 (cib). Modified on 8/5/2019 to terminate TRO motion (cib).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keliihuluhulu: v. Keanaaina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Keka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Falau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maasi Teutau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Triantos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle C. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna S. Sako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fine Teutau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tupou VI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Sonobe Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sione Filikitonga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ferriera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maaki Teutau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy E. Colombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Meno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Semisi Fonua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman A. Keanaaina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Teutau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuela Tatofi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Kawai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salesi He-i-liku Tonga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maaki Teatau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Colombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Leitu Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Felise Auaea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Julia Kamanawa-Kala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Lorna Pikake Spinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Tina Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: John Apele Kaluau, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Cynthia Kamanawa-Cisneros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Spinney Keliihuluhulu:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?