Concrete Coring Company of Hawaii v. Alisa, et al.
Plaintiff: Concrete Coring Company of Hawaii
Defendant: David M. Alisa and Pacific Concrete & Coring, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00422
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED ORDER FOR STAY OF LITIGATION AND COURT DEADLINES - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 10/3/2019. In approximately one year from the date of this Stipulation, the parties will submit for filing a Stipulation and Order for Dismissal Without Prejudice. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the interpretation, implementation or any dispute related to or concerning the Confidential Settlement Agreement. (jo)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter from Mark G. Valencia, Esq. re: status of the updated version of Stipulated Order for Stay of Litigation and Court Deadlines dated September 20, 2019 (jo)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 EO: Based on the parties' request and agreement, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2019 is vacated. The parties shall submit a proposed stipulation regarding a stay of this litigation for review to the Court or shall file a status report on the docket no later than 10/7/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER For Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants David M. Alisa and Pacific Concrete & Coring, Inc. DBA National Concrete Sawing, Exhibit A. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY.(cib)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 EP: Status Conference held. Kale Feldman participated by telephone.Discussion held regarding Stipulated Order for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction Against Defendants.(Court Reporter Cynthia Fazio.) (JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY)(rlfh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 EO: A Status Conference has been set for 8/19/2019 at 2:15 PM before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. (JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY)(tl, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Letter addressed to Judge Susan Oki Mollway from Mark G. Valencia,Esq., dated August 6, 2019 re: REQUEST a Status Conference and provide a brief description of the status of this action. (cib)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/1/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00422-SOM-WRP on all further pleadings. (cib)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David M. Alisa ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2243594.), filed by Concrete Coring Company of Hawaii, A Penhall Company, A California Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Valencia, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Concrete Coring Company of Hawaii v. Alisa, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Alisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Concrete & Coring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concrete Coring Company of Hawaii
Represented By: Ted N. Pettit
Represented By: Mark G. Valencia
Represented By: Stephanie M Segovia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?