Lieblong v. Abella et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Lieblong
Defendant: S/V Talisker, in rem, Doe Government Agencies 1-20, Doe Partnerships 1-20, Ursula Abella, Doe Corporations 1-20 and Doe Defendants 1-20
Case Number: 1:2019cv00425
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 EO: Because Defendants have not yet appeared in this action, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 10/7/2019 to 11/26/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in the Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matthew Lieblong. Ursula Abella waiver sent on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019; S/V Talisker, in rem waiver sent on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Washkowitz, Jared)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Matthew Lieblong. (Attachments: #1 Signed Verification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Washkowitz, Jared)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/7/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ursula Abella, S/V Talisker, in rem. (emt, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00425 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2244044.), filed by Matthew Lieblong. (Attachments: #1 Signed Verification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 (Proposed) Summons , #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Washkowitz, Jared) Docket text modified on 8/7/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lieblong v. Abella et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Lieblong
Represented By: Jared A. Washkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S/V Talisker, in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Government Agencies 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ursula Abella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?