Duff v. Crane Company et al
Plaintiff: Cecil Paul Duff and Cecil Paul Duff, Jr.
Defendant: Does 1 to 25, Crane Company and Ingersoll Rand Co.,
Not Yet Classified: Keith Hunter
Case Number: 1:2019cv00435
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Crane Company Certificate of Service re Defendant Crane Co.'s Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Harstad, William)
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant Crane Co.'s Answer to Ingersoll-Rand Co.'s Cross-Claim Against Other Defendants, Filed August 30, 2019 [ECF No. 9] ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
September 17, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #16 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR has been served by First Class Mail to Keith Hunter at Dispute Prevention & Resolution, Inc., 1003 Bishop Street, Ste 1155, Honolulu, HI 96813 on September 17, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 9/16/2019. Keith Hunter of Dispute Prevention and Resolution, Inc. added as mediator. (emt, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 Scheduling Conference not held.Discussion had.All parties agree to joint mediation with Keith Hunter, and request that the Court enter a mediation order consistent with the terms referenced in the letter submitted by Mr. DeRobertis on 8/27/19.Court will be issuing a mediation order and scheduling a telephone status conference before the end of the year. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Segawa, Alyssa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Crane Co.'s Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND CO.'S RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (Goodwin, Christopher)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Ingersoll Rand Co.,. (Goodwin, Christopher)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll Rand Co., identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll Rand Co.,.. (Goodwin, Christopher)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant Ingersoll-Rand's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Crane Company by Ingersoll Rand Co.,. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against Other Defendants, #2 Answer to Cross-Claim Asserted by All Other Defendants Against Ingersoll-Rand Co., #3 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Planning Meeting (Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Rom Trader from L. Richard DeRobertis, Esq., dated August 27, 2019 Re: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for September 16, 2019. . (DeRobertis, L.) Docket text modified on 8/28/2019 (emt, ).
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS FROM THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAII; CV 19-1-1103-07 JHA. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet; CV 19-1-1138-07 JHA, #4 Complaint; Summons (CV 19-1-1103-07 JHA), #5 Complaint; Summons (CV 19-1-1138-07 JHA), #6 Request to Exempt Case from Court Annexed Arbitration Program; Summary of Facts (CV 19-1-1103-07 JHA), #7 Request to Exempt Case from Court Annexed Arbitration Program; Summary of Facts (CV 19-1-1138-07 JHA), #8 Arbitration Administrator's Decision to Exempt Case from Arbitration Program (CV 19-1-1138-07 JHA), #9 Declaration of Service; Exhibit A (CV 19-1-1103-07 JHA), #10 Arbitration Administrator's Decision to Exempt Case from Arbitration Program (CV 19-1-1103-07 JHA), #11 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Exhibit A; Certificate of Service (CV 19-1-1103-07 JHA), #12 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 8) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (emt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2019: #13 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 8) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #14 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 8 ) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (emt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2019: #15 Exhibit A (Part 4 of 8) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #16 Exhibit A (Part 5 of 8) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #17 Exhibit A (Part 6 of 8) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #18 Exhibit A (Part 7 of 8) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #19 Exhibit A (Part 8 of 8) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #20 Certificate of Service to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (emt, ). Modified on 8/22/2019 (emt, ).
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant Crane Co.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed July 12, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM Against All Other Defendants against Does 1 to 25, Ingersoll Rand Co., by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against All Other Defendants, #2 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William) Modified on 8/20/2019 (emt, ).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/16/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00435 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crane Company by Crane Company Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal [ECF 1]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4a - Forman Affidavit, Ex. A, A-5, A-7, #2 Exhibit 4b - Forman,Samuel.Affidavit. Ex. A-16, A-19, A-24, A-26, A-27, #3 Exhibit 5 - Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harstad, William)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crane Company by Crane Company Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal [ECF 1]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3b - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. G, H, J, L, #2 Exhibit 3c - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. N, O, P, #3 Exhibit 3d - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. R, T, U)(Harstad, William)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Company Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal from First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, case number 19-1-1103-07 JHA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2246312), filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William M. Harstad, #2 Exhibit 1 - Cecil Paul Duff, Jr. Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Friemoth Affidavit, Ex. A, B, C, D, #4 Exhibit 3a - Sargent,David.Affidavit, Ex. A, A-1, B, D)(Harstad, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duff v. Crane Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: William M. Harstad
Represented By: Derek B Simon
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Co.,
Represented By: Christopher S. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Paul Duff
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Represented By: Allison M. Fujita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Paul Duff, Jr.
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Represented By: Allison Mina Aoki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Keith Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?