Carbonview Limited, LLC et al v. Kane et al
Appellant: Carbonview Limited, LLC and Island Leasing, LLC
Debtor: Hawaii Island Air, Inc.
Appellee: Elizabeth A. Kane and AAR Supply Chain, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00436
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 Additional Exhibits to #9 Appellant's Brief, #10 Additional Exhibits, Appendix Vol 2 App 30 pt 2 filed by Carbonview Limited, LLC, Island Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Vol 2 App 30 pt 3, #2 Appendix Vol 2 App 31, #3 Appendix Vol 2 App 32 pt 1, #4 Appendix Vol 2 App 32 pt 2, #5 Appendix Vol 3 App 33-40, #6 Appendix Vol 3 App 41-52, #7 Appendix Vol App 53-55)(Muzzi, Christopher)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Additional Exhibits to #9 Appellant's Brief, Appendix Vol 1 App 3-23 filed by Carbonview Limited, LLC, Island Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Vol 1 App 24-26, #2 Appendix Vol 1 App 26 pt 2, #3 Appendix Vol 2 App 27-29, #4 Appendix Vol 2 App 29 pt 2, #5 Appendix Vol 2 App 29 pt 3, #6 Appendix Vol 2 App 30 pt 1)(Muzzi, Christopher)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 Appellant's BRIEF by Carbonview Limited, LLC, Island Leasing, LLC. Appellee Brief due by 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix (Excerpts of Record) to Opening Brief, #2 Appendix Vol 1 App 1, #3 Appendix Vol 1 App 2 pt 1, #4 Appendix Vol 1 App 2 pt 2, #5 Appendix Vol 1 App 2 pt 3, #6 Appendix Vol 1 App 2 pt 4, #7 Appendix Vol 1 App 2 pt 5)(Muzzi, Christopher)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elaine T. Chow on behalf of Elizabeth A. Kane. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chow, Elaine)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carisa L. K. Duffy on behalf of Elizabeth A. Kane. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Duffy, Carisa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 EO: On September 10, 2019, a Certificate or Readiness was filed by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Hawaii as to Appellants Carbonview Ltd., LLC and Island Leasing, LLCs appeal of the Bankruptcy Courts July 30, 2019 Order Granting Trustees Motion for Order Approving Settlement Agreement with AAR Supply Chair, Inc. ECF No. 5. The court will hold a hearing on the Appeal on December 16, 2019, at 10 a.m. Briefing shall be filed and served pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018(a) and Local Rule 8009.1. Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal is set for 12/16/2019 10:00 AM in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(tbf, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 U.S. Bankruptcy Court's Certificate of Readiness (Attachments: #1 Notice of Completion of Record on Appeal) (jo)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO DARRYL P. RAINS re: #3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 8/29/2019. DARRYL P. RAINS, ESQ. (Law Firm: Morriston & Foerster LLP) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Appellants Carbonview Limited, LLC and Island Leasing, LLC (jo)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Darryl P. Rains) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2254845.Christopher J. Muzzi appearing for Appellants Carbonview Limited, LLC, Island Leasing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel)(Muzzi, Christopher)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00436 JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL TO DISTRICT COURT: NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT Bankruptcy Court Case Number: 17-01078 - filed by Carbonview Limited, LLC, Island Leasing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 Order Granting Trustee's Motion For Order Approving Settlement Agreement With AAR Supply Chain, Inc., filed on July 30, 2019; Exhibit A, #3 Notice Regarding Appeal) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carbonview Limited, LLC et al v. Kane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carbonview Limited, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Muzzi
Represented By: Darryl P. Rains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Island Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Muzzi
Represented By: Darryl P. Rains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Hawaii Island Air, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Elizabeth A. Kane
Represented By: Simon Klevansky
Represented By: Alika L. Piper
Represented By: Carisa L. K. Duffy
Represented By: Elaine T. Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: AAR Supply Chain, Inc.
Represented By: Veronica A Nordyke
Represented By: Michael A. Yoshida
Represented By: Gregory W. Kugle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?