Yorong v. Crane Company et al
Plaintiff: Julian Yorong, Sr.
Defendant: Crane Company, Does 1-25 and Ingersoll Rand Co.,
Case Number: 1:2019cv00438
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 EO: As previously discussed at the September 23, 2019 Status Conference in 1:19-cv-00445-DKW-KJM, counsels L. Richard DeRobertis and William M. Harstad have agreed on vacating Rule 16 Scheduling Conference in this case and to set this case accordingly with 1:19-cv-00445-DKW-KJM. Counsel William M. Harstad informs the Court that he will get back to the Court once he has discussed it with his client. On October 3, 2019, counsel William M. Harstad informs the Court that his client have also agreed on vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference in this case and to set this case accordingly with 1:19-cv-00445-DKW-KJM. Therefore, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2019 is hereby VACATED. A Status Conference is set for March 25, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield.related: #11 Report of Planning Meeting. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant Crane Co.'s Answer to Ingersoll Rand Co.'s Cross-Claims Against All Other Defendants Filed August 26, 2019 [Doc #8 ]; Certificate of Service by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William) Modified docket text on 9/11/2019 (ens).
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (DeRobertis, L.)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll Rand Co., identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll Rand Co.,.. (Goodwin, Christopher)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Ingersoll Rand Co.,. (Goodwin, Christopher)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Ingersoll-Rand's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Crane Company by Ingersoll Rand Co.,. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against Other Defendants, #2 Answer to Cross-Claim Asserted by All Other Defendants Against Ingersoll-Rand Co., #3 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant Crane Co.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed July 19, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM Cross-Claim Against All Other Defendants against Does 1-25, Ingersoll Rand Co., by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against All Other Defendants, #2 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS From First Circuit Court - State of Hawai'i; Their Civil Case Number: 19-1-1138-07-JHA. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court of the First Circuit - Computerized Index - Civil Information Sheet) (cib) State Court Pleadings attached to the notice of removal and additional exhibits filed on 8/13/2019 by Defendant Crane Company re #1 , #2 , #3 .
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 10/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00438 SOM-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Company, #2 Supplement, filed by Crane Company by Crane Company Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal [ECF 1]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4a - Forman Affidavit, Ex. A, A-5, A-7, #2 Exhibit 4b - Forman,Samuel.Affidavit. Ex. A-16, A-19, A-24, A-26, A-27, #3 Exhibit 5 - Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Filing of Notice of Remova, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harstad, William) Modified on 8/15/2019 (cib, ).
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Company by Crane Company Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal [ECF 1]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3b - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. G, H, J, L, #2 Exhibit 3c - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. N, O, P, #3 Exhibit 3d - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. R, T, U)(Harstad, William) Modified on 8/15/2019 (cib, ).
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Company Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1442 & 1446 from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 19-1-1138-07 (JHA). ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2246895), filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William M. Harstad, #2 Exhibit 1 - Julian Yorong, Sr. Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Friemoth Affidavit, Ex. A, B, C, D, #4 Exhibit 3a - Sargent,David.Affidavit, Ex. A, A-1, B, D)(Harstad, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yorong v. Crane Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Yorong, Sr.
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: William M. Harstad
Represented By: Derek B Simon
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Co.,
Represented By: Christopher S. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?