Pai v. County of Hawaii
Plaintiff: Kaheana Kathleen Kawale Pai and Keawe Bradley Dean Mahina Pai
Defendant: Doe Corporations 2-10, County of Hawaii, John Doe 2, Jane Does 1-10, Doe Governmental Entities 1-10, John Does 3-10 and John Doe 1
Case Number: 1:2019cv00440
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Laureen L. Martin on behalf of County of Hawaii on behalf of County of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Laureen)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 EO: Roland Talon is allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/19 @ 9:00 a.m. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by County of Hawaii.(Talon, Roland)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaheana Kathleen Kawale Pai. County of Hawaii served on 8/20/2019 . (Hsieh, Peter) Modified on 8/26/2019 (emt, ).
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 EO: The Court RESCHEDULES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/19 @ 9:00 AM to 10/29/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 10/22/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to County of Hawaii. (emt, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00440 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT , DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, (Proposed) SUMMONS against County of Hawaii ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2247155.), filed by Keawe D. M. Pai Keawe Bradley Dean Mahina Pai and Kaheana Kathleen Kawale Pai . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hsieh, Peter) Docket text modified on 8/13/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pai v. County of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 2-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Hawaii
Represented By: Laureen L. Martin
Represented By: Roland J. Talon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 3-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaheana Kathleen Kawale Pai
Represented By: Peter C. Hsieh
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keawe Bradley Dean Mahina Pai
Represented By: Peter C. Hsieh
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?