Wilcox v. Association of Apartment Owners of Kihei Villages
Plaintiff: Drenda-Ann Marie Wilcox
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Kihei Villages
Case Number: 1:2019cv00444
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Kihei Villages (jo)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 10/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00444-JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Drenda-Ann Marie Wilcox. (Ho, Timothy)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Kihei Villages ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2248660.), filed by Drenda-Ann Marie Wilcox.(Ho, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcox v. Association of Apartment Owners of Kihei Villages
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Kihei Villages
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drenda-Ann Marie Wilcox
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?