Williams v. Cook, et al
Plaintiff: Maunu Renah Williams
Defendant: Greg K. Nakamura, Maria Cook and Bradley R. Tamm
Interested Party: Shelley Harrington and Laurie Nadamoto
Case Number: 1:2019cv00453
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 23 EO: On September 24, 2019, Plaintiff Maunu Renah Williams filed a "Motion for Withdraw [sic] of Claim Against the Defendants." ECF No. #22 . Plaintiff states that he "would like to... withdraw [his] claim against all (3) defendants." Id. at PageID #141. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiff may voluntarily dismiss an action without a court order by filing "a notice of dismissal before the opposing party serves either an answer or a motion for summary judgment[.]" Here, Plaintiff has not served either his original or amended complaint, and no defendant has filed either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Thus, the court construes Plaintiffs Motion as a Notice of Withdrawal and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to terminate this action. All pending motions in this case are MOOT. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION NOTICE For Withdraw of Claim Against Defendants Due To Review of Prior Case - by Plaintiff Maunu Renah Williams (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jo) Docket Text Modified on 9/27/2019 (jo)
September 23, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #21 has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record for Plaintiff Maunu Renah Williams. (jo)
September 19, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION For I.F.P. To Proceed and Extraordinary Relief - by Plaintiff Maunu Renah Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Transmittal Letter, #5 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 18, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #20 will be served to Maunu Renah Williams on September 19, 2019 by First Class Mail to the address of record. (jo)
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION For Ex Parte I.F.P. Relief from Judge - by Plaintiff Maunu Renah Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Ex Parte Application For Relief From Costs, #8 Mailing Envelope) Clerk's note: There is no Exhibit F in the papers received with this mailing(jo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Poverty - by Maunu Renah Williams (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST For Extraordinary Relief - by Maunu Renah Williams (Attachments: #1 ODC Documents, #2 Circuit Court Documents, #3 Copy of a Letter to Attorney Eric Seitz, #4 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED REQUEST For Extraordinary Relief Counsel - by Plaintiff Maunu Renah Williams (Attachments: #1 Letter to Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright in Support of Motion, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION To Proceed In Forma Pauperis By A Prisoner - by Plaintiff Maunu Renah Williams This document was received in the same envelope as ECF #15 (jo)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Maria Cook, Greg K. Nakamura, Bradley R. Tamm - filed by Maunu Renah Williams. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Documents, #2 Transmittal Letter / Certificate of Service, #3 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 "DECLARATION Due to 28 USC 1915(g) Imminent Danger of Physical Harm Due to Hostile Environment...." (Attachments: #1 Letter addressed to USDC Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 "Declaration & Testimony" re #1 Complaint - filed by Maunu Renah Williams Letter dated 8/19/2019 addressed to US Clerk of US District Court (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 "DECLARATION in Support of Request For Relief Due to Imminent Danger of Physical Harm After HCF, DPS and Defendant violated the 8th Amendment of US Constitution (PREA)" - filed by Maunu Renah Williams (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 "Affidavit of Death Murder of Me (Reckless Endangerment)" re #1 Complaint - filed by Maunu Renah Williams Letter dated 8/17/2019 addressed to "Judge Susan Oki Mollway, US J. Michael Seabright, Screener US District Court Clerk, FBI, CIA, PREA" (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Maria Cook, Greg K. Nakamura, Bradley R. Tamm - filed by Maunu Renah Williams. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright, #2 Letter from ODC to Plaintiff dated July 9, 2019, #3 Letter from DPS to Plaintiff dated July 12, 2019, #4 Plaintiff's Request for Emergency Over Detention Evidentiary Hearing, filed in Third Circuit, State of Hawaii, #5 Mailing Envelope) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Cook, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg K. Nakamura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley R. Tamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maunu Renah Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?