Olivas v. Cutter CJD, et al.
Plaintiff: Mignonette Olivas
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Cutter CJD and Doe Defendants 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00454
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing is set for 11/21/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (tbf, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Justin A. Brackett appearing for Plaintiff Mignonette Olivas (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brackett, Justin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 EO: In light of Mr. Brackett's representation of Plaintiff's intentions to file a Motion for Remand, the Court continues the Rule 16 from September 23, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. to December 16, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rom A. Trader. The Motion for Remand to be filed by October 7, 2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/16/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER in Courtroom 5.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Rom Trader from Justin A. Brackett, Esq., Re: Request to continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for September 23, 2019, dated September 4, 2019. (emt, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS FROM THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAII, CV 19-1-0105-01 GWBC. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Complaint; Exhibits A-E; Verification; Summons, #4 Request to Exempt Case from Court Annexed Arbitration Program, #5 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (FCA Dodge USA, LLC), #6 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (Cutter CJD, Inc.), #7 Amended Complaint; Exhibits A-E; Verification; Summons, #8 Defendant Cutter CJD, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint; Certificate of Service, #9 Summons issued, #10 Defendant FCA US LLC's Answer to Complaint; Certificate of Service, #11 Amended Certificate of Service, #12 Defendant FCA US LLC's Answer to Amended Complaint; Certificate of Service, #13 Defendant Cutter CJD, Inc.'s Answer to Amended Complaint; Certificate of Service, #14 Certificate of Service, #15 Certificate of Service, #16 Certificate of Service, #17 Certificate of Service, #18 Certificate of Service, #19 Certificate of Service, #20 Certificate of Service, #21 Certificate of Service, #22 Certificate of Service, #23 Certificate of Service, #24 Pretrial Statement, #25 Certificate of Service, #26 Defendant FCA US LLC's Responsive Pretrial Statement, #27 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Law; Exhibit - Second Amended Complaint with Exhibits; Certificate of Service, #28 Notice of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Certificate of Service, #29 Notice of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Certificate of Service, #30 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Exhibit 1; Certificate of Service) (emt, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., Corporate Parent EXOR S.p.A. for FCA US LLC.. (Tilker, Brian)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet by FCA US LLC. (Tilker, Brian)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/23/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00454-DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (cib)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US LLC from First Circuit Court State of Hawaii, case number 19-1-0105-01. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2251442), filed by FCA US LLC (dba Chrysler Corporation and Chrysler Group LLC). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian W. Tilker, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Certificate of Service)(Tilker, Brian) Modified docket text on 8/22/2019 (cib).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olivas v. Cutter CJD, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Erik Andrew Rask
Represented By: Brian W. Tilker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutter CJD
Represented By: Joachim P. Cox
Represented By: Abigail Marie Holden
Represented By: Robert K. Fricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mignonette Olivas
Represented By: Justin A. Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?