Richardson v. Burlington Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Florence Richardson and Allene K. Suemori
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Burlington Insurance Company, The and Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00455
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
2 Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #12 Order to Show Cause,,, filed by Burlington Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Defendant The Burlington Insurance Company's Response to Order to Show Cause Dated September 4, 2019)(Hikida, Christopher)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 9/4/2019. Accordingly, Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant must file a response to this Order to Show Cause by September 18, 2019, identifying the Plaintiffs' citizenships and showing, by a preponderance of the evidence, that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. Failure to timely respond to this Order to Show Cause will result in a finding that Defendant has failed to carry its burden of establishing subject matter jurisdiction and the Court will remand this action. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2019. (emt, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 EO: The Court finds good cause to grant counsel's stipulated request to continue the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to allow further settlement discussions. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/19 is CONTINUED to 11/04/2019 at 09:00AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00455-JAO-WRP on all further pleadings. (cib)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 9/3/2019. JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE for all further proceedings. Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00455-JAO-WRP on all further pleadings. (cib)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00455-LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (cib)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 8/26/2019. JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI for all further proceedings. (cib)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/23/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00455 SOM-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Burlington Insurance Company re Notice of Removal and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Hikida, Christopher) Modified on 8/29/2019 (cib, ).
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Burlington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Guilford Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Alamance Insurance Company, Corporate Parent FFIC Holdings Incorporated, Corporate Parent International Financial Group, Inc. for The Burlington Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hikida, Christopher)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by The Burlington Insurance Company. (Hikida, Christopher)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Burlington Insurance Company from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 19-1-1167-07. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2252180), filed by The Burlington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Certificate of Service)(Hikida, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Burlington Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Richardson
Represented By: Sheree A. Kon-Herrera
Represented By: Wesley H.H. Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allene K. Suemori
Represented By: Sheree A. Kon-Herrera
Represented By: Wesley H.H. Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Christopher K. Hikida
Represented By: Edmund K. Saffery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?