Aubart v. McCarthy
Plaintiff: Kevin T. Aubart
Defendant: Honorable Ryan McCarthy
Case Number: 1:2019cv00459
Filed: August 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 EO: To allow Plaintiff Kevin T. Aubart sufficient time to serve the Government, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 10/21/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 12/09/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 12/02/2019. Mr. Aubart has been notified via telephone and agrees with the continuance. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 Scheduling Conference Statement; Certificate of Service, by Kevin T. Aubart, Pro Se Plaintiff. (apg, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Honorable Ryan McCarthy (jo)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 10/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Plaintiff was served on August 26, 2019 a copy of the foregoing document by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 25, 2019 Filing 1 PLAINTIFF'S FEDERAL TORTS CLAIM ACT (FTCA) COMPLAINT against Honorable Ryan McCarthy - filed by Kevin T. Aubart. (Attachments: #1 Receipt #HI027117 for Filing Fee) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aubart v. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin T. Aubart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Ryan McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?