Roy's Holdings, Inc. et al v. OS Pacific, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Roy's Holdings, Inc. and Roy Yamaguchi
Defendant: OSP Pacific, LLC, Doe Defendants 1-20 and OS Pacific, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00469
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER, Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 10/28/2019. (apg, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - Discussion had.Non Jury Trial is set for 10/27/20 @ 9:00 a.m before Judge Kay.An Early Settlement Conference is set for 1/16/20 @ 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Early Settlement Conference Letters are due by 1/9/20. Representatives may appear by telephone, but must be available throughout the duration of the conference.Court to issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order.Dates given: Non-Jury Trial is set for 10/27/2020 09:00 AM before JUDGE ALAN C. KAY. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/15/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 1/16/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 7/27/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 5/27/2020. Discovery due by 8/28/2020. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Roy's Holdings, Inc., Roy Yamaguchi. (Lam, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Lam, Michael)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roy's Holdings, Inc., Roy Yamaguchi. OS Pacific, LLC served on 9/17/2019. (Lam, Michael) Docket Text Modified on 10/1/2019 (jo)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roy's Holdings, Inc.. (Lam, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to OS Pacific, LLC (jo)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Roy's Holdings, Inc., Roy Yamaguchi. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Lam, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to OSP Pacific, LLC. (cib)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 10/28/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00469-ACK-RT on all further pleadings. (cib)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; Summons against OSP Pacific, LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2255547.), filed by Roy's Holdings, Inc., Roy Yamaguchi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lam, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy's Holdings, Inc. et al v. OS Pacific, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy's Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie M Segovia
Represented By: Harrison K. Goo
Represented By: Michael L. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Yamaguchi
Represented By: Stephanie M Segovia
Represented By: Harrison K. Goo
Represented By: Michael L. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSP Pacific, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OS Pacific, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?