Matsuoka v. Mateo-Soto
Plaintiff: Misato Matsuoka
Defendant: Andres Mateo-Soto
Case Number: 1:2019cv00470
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 COUNTERCLAIM ADDENDUM re: #9 - filed by Andres Mateo-Soto (jo)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 EO: Defendant and Counter Claimant Andres M. Mateo-Soto, proceeding pro se, filed a Motion to Dismiss on October 21, 2019. (ECF No. #11 ).The Court provided a briefing schedule in ECF No. #12 .On October 23, 2019, the Defendant filed a document also entitled Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #13 ). The Court admonishes the Defendant that he has not complied with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court treats the October 23, 2019 filing as an addendum to the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #11 ) filed on October 21, 2019.Defendant is warned that all future filings must conform to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii Local Rules.Future filings that fail to conform to the rules may be stricken. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(rls, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 Failure to State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andres Mateo-Soto (jo)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 EO: On October 21, 2019, Defendant and Counter Claimant Andres M. Mateo-Soto, proceeding pro se, filed:MOTION TO DISMISS. (ECF No. #11 ).Plaintiff and Counter Defendant shall file an Opposition on or before Tuesday, November 12, 2019. Defendant and Counter Claimant may Reply on or before Friday, November 29, 2019. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(d), the Court elects to decide the matter without a hearing. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(rls, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss - by Defendant Andres Mateo-Soto (jo)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWERING CLAIMS FOR RELIEF re #1 - filed by Andres Mateo-Soto (jo)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint; Defendant's COUNTERCLAIM against Misato Matsuoka - by Andres Mateo-Soto (jo)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Misato Matsuoka. Andres Mateo-Soto served on 10-10-19. (Stewart, Andrew) Docket Text Modified on 10/15/2019 (jo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 EO: Counsel Andrew D. Stewart informs the Court that service on Defendant has been unsuccessful and would like to request more time to serve. For good cause show, the request is granted. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 10/28/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 12/03/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 11/27/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andres Mateo-Soto. (emt, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Stewart, Andrew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 10/28/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00470 HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andres Mateo-Soto ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2255759.), filed by Misato Matsuoka.(Stewart, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matsuoka v. Mateo-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andres Mateo-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misato Matsuoka
Represented By: Andrew D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?