James-Watson v. D'Andrea, et al
Plaintiff: Janice James-Watson
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Entities 1-10
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Anthony D'Andrea
3Rd Party Defendant: Trevor Watson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00474
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janice James-Watson Plaintiff Janice James-Watson's First Request for Admissions to Defendant Anthony D'Andrea (Kodish, Stuart)
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janice James-Watson Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Kodish, Stuart)
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony D'Andrea re Initial Disclosures (Nakamura, Lee)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Trevor Watson (jo)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Trevor Watson, filed by Anthony D'Andrea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service)(Nakamura, Lee)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 10/7/2019. (Jury Trial set for 10/6/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright) (Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rom Trader) (jo)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - Discussion had re: Plaintiff's condition, and status of this case.Jury Selection/Trial is set for 10/6/20 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Seabright.A Status Conference is set for 2/24/20 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Trader.Counsel do not need to submit anything in writing.Court to issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 10/6/2020 in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/27/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 7/6/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Status Conference is set for 2/24/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 5/6/2020. Discovery due by 8/7/2020. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nakamura, Lee)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kodish, Stuart)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint Filed July 29, 2019 by Anthony D'Andrea. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nakamura, Lee)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Rule 26(f) Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kodish, Stuart)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart M. Kodish on behalf of Janice James-Watson on behalf of Janice James-Watson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kodish, Stuart)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS From Circuit Court of the First Circuit of Hawaii; CV 19-1-1193-07 JPC (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Re: HAJIS, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint, #5 Defendant Anthony D'Andrea's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (jo)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony D'Andrea re #1 Notice of Removal, First Amended Certificate of Service (Nakamura, Lee)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Anthony D'Andrea. (Nakamura, Lee)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/7/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00474-JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (cib)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anthony D'Andrea from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 19-1-1193-07 JPC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2256624), filed by Anthony D'Andrea. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee T. Nakamura, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Demand for Jury Trial, #5 Certificate of Service)(Nakamura, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James-Watson v. D'Andrea, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice James-Watson
Represented By: James T. Leavitt, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart M. Kodish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Anthony D'Andrea
Represented By: Richard B Miller
Represented By: Lee T. Nakamura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Trevor Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?