Asemani v. Islamic Republic of Iran, The
Plaintiff: Billy G. Asemani
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv00477
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 10/7/2019 pursuant to ECF No. #4 DISMISSAL ORDER. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Billy G. Asemani shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on October 8, 2019.
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DISMISSAL ORDER re #1 , #3 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 10/7/2019. (1) The July 1, 2019 Deficiency Order, ECF No. 2, is VACATED. (2) Asemani's Motion For an Extension of Time, ECF No. 3, is DENIED. (3) The Complaint and this action are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Clerk SHALL terminate this case. The Court will take no further action herein beyond processing a notice of appeal. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Billy G. Asemani shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on October 8, 2019.
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Se/Indigent Plaintiff's MOTION for an Extension of Time Until November 01, 2019 to Respond to the Court's Deficiency Order re #2 - by Plaintiff Billy G. Asemani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Mailing Documentation) (emt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #3 Transmittal Letter from Billy G. Asemani) (emt, ).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/3/2019. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Bill G. Asemani served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on September 6, 2019. A copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner form and instructions was included in the mailing to Mr. Asemani. A file-stamped copy of the Complaint was included in the mailing.
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT Pursuant to Title 28 U.S.C. 1330 ("Actions Against Foreign States"), Title 28 U.S.C. 1602 et seq., ("The Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act"), & ("The Full Faith and Credit Act") against Islamic Republic of Iran, The - filed by Billy G. Asemani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Memo from Plaintiff to Clerk, #4 Inmate Locator, #5 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asemani v. Islamic Republic of Iran, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy G. Asemani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?