Williams v. Espinda
Petitioner: Maunu Renah Williams
Respondent: dir dps Nolan P Espinda
Interested Party: Laurie Nadamoto and Shelley Harrington
Case Number: 1:2019cv00478
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 EO: Petitioner's "Motion to Acknowled of Exraordinary Circumstance Request of Contacting DPS Dir. and HCF Warden and Record of to Correct Max Date in HCF Computer from Nov. 16, 2019 to Oct. 15, 2019 to Avoid Further Pleading After Dismissal," [ECF 12], is DENIED for the reasons set forth in the 09/16/2019 Order Dismissing Petition and Denying Certificate of Appealability [ECF 3]. Petitioner must address his concerns concerning the calculation of his maximum date of release to the Hawaii state courts. This action remains closed. The Court will take no further action on any documents submitted in this case beyond processing a properly filed notice of appeal. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(tl, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Acknowled of Exraordinary Circumstance Request of Contacting DPS Dir. and HCF Warden and Record of to Correct Max Date in HCF Computer from Nov. 16, 2019 to Oct. 15, 2019 to Avoid Further Pleading After Dismissal - by Petitioner Maunu Renah Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Receiving Order of Dismissal But Request for Judge to Notify the Defendant of H.C.F. Still in Non-Compliance of Oct. 15, 2019 Max Release Date in Computer After Monica Lortz Sent Them Memo to Avoid Further Future Pleading After Oct. 15, 2019 - submitted by Maunu Renah Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT Record of Compliance re #2 - by Maunu Renah Williams. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 EO: Petitioner's Emergency Motion [ECF 5], and Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis [ECF 6], are DENIED for the reasons set forth in the 09/16/2019 Order Dismissing Petition and Denying Certificate of Appealability [ECF 3]. This action remains closed. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(tl, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Transmittal Letter from Maunu Renah Williams, dated September 12, 2019, re ECF Nos. #5 , #6 , #7 . (emt, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of: In Forma Pauperis Order Received HCF Mail Sept. 11, 2019 re #6 - by Maunu Renah Williams. (Attachments: #1 Habeas Deficiency Order, #2 Ex Parte Application for Relief from Costs (State of Hawaii form)) (emt, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Petitioner Maunu Renah Williams. (emt, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extraordinary Relief Due to Order of Proof of Corpus Delicit Chain of Conspiracy to Injure the Plaintiff by Acts of Seditious Conspiracy Against U.S. Constitution and Amendment VI and Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright as U.. Government Order for H.C.F. D.P.S. to Provide In Forma Pauperis 6 Mo Account Statement as State of Hawaii Employees - by Petitioner Maunu Renah Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
September 16, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #3 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY and #4 Clerk's Judgment shall be served by First Class Mail to Maunu Renah Williams at the address of record on September 17, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 9/16/2019 pursuant to ECF No. #3 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. (emt, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY re #1 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 9/16/2019. (1) Williams's Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMISSED. This dismissal is without leave to amend but without prejudice to raising any constitutional claims regarding his sentence after such claims are fully exhausted. (2) Any certificate of appealability is DENIED. (3) The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and close the case. (emt, )
September 5, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Order, and Blank Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis By A Prisoner has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record for Maunu Renah Williams on 9/5/2019. (ens)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Habeas Deficiency ORDER re #1 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/5/2019. (ens)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION Under 28 2241 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Maunu Renah Williams. (No Fee or IFP Submitted) (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(ens)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Espinda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: dir dps Nolan P Espinda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maunu Renah Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?