HB Productions, Inc. v. Muhammad Faizan, et al
Plaintiff: HB Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Muhammad Faizan, John Doe and Does 1-35
Case Number: 1:2019cv00487
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing not held.Discussion held.Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is continued to January 8, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield.EO:The Court previously set the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for January 8, 2020 at 9:30 a.m.. Due to a conflict in the Courts schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for January 8, 2020 IS CONTINUED to January 9, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield in Courtroom 8. (Ctrm C8 - No Record 9:41 - 9:43.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #1 Main Document) (bbb, ).
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HB Productions, Inc. Muhammad Faizan served on 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Muhammad Abeed Atif)(Culpepper, Kerry) Docket Text Modified on 10/16/2019 (jo)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion #9 First Ex Parte Motion by Kerry S. Culpepper on behalf of HB Productions, Inc.. (Culpepper, Kerry) Modified to link to Motion on 10/7/2019 (jo)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 EO: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS #11 Plaintiff's First Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint and Summons. Plaintiff's new deadline to serve the defendants is 03/07/2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 10/03/2019.(mansfield2)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 EX PARTE Motion FIRST MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff HB Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel)(Culpepper, Kerry)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE re: #6 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 9/25/2019. (jo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 First Ex Parte MOTION ORDER PERMITING CLERK TO PERFORM FOREIGN MAILING Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff HB Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum re Motion, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Culpepper, Kerry) Docket Text Modified on 9/13/2019 (jo)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Muhammad Faizan (jo)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Culpepper, Kerry)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE Motion FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion)(Culpepper, Kerry)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 11/4/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00487-JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by HB Productions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Millennium Funding, Inc. for HB Productions, Inc... (Culpepper, Kerry)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Exhibits 1-4; Declaration of Stephanie Kessner; Declaration of Counsel FOR CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, INTENTIONAL INDUCEMENT, DIRECT COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, AND FALSE ADVERTISING against Does 1-35, John Doe, Muhammad Faizan ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2259117.), filed by HB Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Declaration of Stephanie Kessner, #6 Declaration of Counsel, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Copyright Report)(Culpepper, Kerry) Modified docket text on 9/9/2019 (cib).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HB Productions, Inc. v. Muhammad Faizan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muhammad Faizan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-35
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HB Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?