Burns v. State of Hawaii
Plaintiff: Nicholas Burns
Defendant: State of Hawaii
Interested Party: Shelley Harrington and Laurie Nadamoto
Case Number: 1:2019cv00488
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 EO: This action, which was brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1455, was remanded to the Circuit Court of the Third Circuit on 09/12/2019 [ECF 3]. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(d), and for the reasons stated in the Order of Remand, Plaintiff's Objection to Order of Remand [ECF 8], is DISMISSED. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(d) (stating that, except for cases removed pursuant to 1442 or 1443, "[a]n order remanding a case to the State court from which it was removed is not reviewable on appeal or otherwise"). IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #3 "Order of Remand" for Good Cause Shown to Prevent this Miscarriage of Justice, Under Protest - filed by Nicholas Burns. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Remedy Forms, #2 "Right to Subrogation", #3 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 ORIGINAL SIGNATURE of Petitioner Nicholas Burns submitted re #1 [Complaint] "Removal of Criminal Prosecution from State of Hawaii for case number: 3CRC-19-468". (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT by the Circuit Court of the Third Circuit, State of Hawaii re #3 ORDER OF REMAND. (emt, )
September 13, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #3 ORDER OF REMAND and copy of the #4 Transmittal Letter have been served by First Class Mail to Nicholas Burns at the address of record on September 13, 2019. A certified copy of the Order, Petitioner's document titled "Removal of Criminal Prosecution from State of Hawaii for case number: 3CPC-19-468" and Docket Sheet shall be served by First Class Mail to the Circuit Court of the Third Circuit, State of Hawaii on September 13, 2019. (emt, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Transmittal Letter to the Circuit Court of the Third Circuit, State of Hawaii re ECF No. #3 ORDER OF REMAND, dated September 13, 2019. (emt, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REMAND re #1 , #2 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 9/12/2019. This action is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the Third Circuit, State of Hawaii. Any pending motions are DENIED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file and terminate this action. (emt, )
September 10, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #1 Complaint, #2 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Advisory Entry have been served by First Class Mail to Nicholas Burns at the address of record on September 10, 2019. A "business reply" envelope was included in the mailing to Mr. Burns. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
September 10, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket number #1 Complaint, filed by Nicholas Burns is not signed. The filing party is directed to sign the enclosed copy of the Complaint and mail it back to the Clerk's Office in the enclosed "business reply" envelope. (emt, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Plaintiff Nicholas Burns. (emt, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ("Removal of Criminal Prosecution from State of Hawaii for case number: 3CPC-19-468") against State of Hawaii - filed by Nicholas Burns. This document is not signed. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?