Keller v. Ala Wai State Boat Harbor
Plaintiff: Larry Keller
Defendant: Ala Wai State Boat Harbor
Case Number: 1:2019cv00489
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 EO: To allow sufficient time for service of the Summons and Complaint by the United States Marshals Service as ordered by the Court on 9/18/2019, see ECF No. #4 , the Court CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2019 to 1/14/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 EO: COURT ORDER CONSTRUING PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT, FILED SEPTEMBER 27, 2019, AS A SUPPLEMENT TO THE COMPLAINT. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(rls, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 EO: COURT ORDER DENYING AS PREMATURE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(rls, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Replace Vessel - by Plaintiff Larry Keller. (emt, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ala Wai State Boat Harbor - filed by Larry Keller. (emt, )
September 19, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a certified copy of the #4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS has been served by First Class Mail to Larry Keller at the address of record on September 19, 2019. The following documents or forms were included in the mailing to Mr. Keller: 1) certified copy of the Complaint with the Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Order affixed; 2) a copy of the issued summons; 3) Civil Waiver of Service Packet (AO 398 and 399 forms); 4) USM-285 form. Additionally, a certified copy of the #4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS shall be served to the U.S. Marshals Service through interoffice delivery. (emt, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from the Clerk's Office to Plaintiff Larry Keller re service documents, pursuant to ECF No. #4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS, dated September 19, 2019. (emt, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ala Wai State Boat Harbor. (emt, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address - by Larry Keller. (emt, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re #2 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 9/18/2019. This Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to issue the summons and to provide Plaintiff with the instructions and all other forms necessary for the United States Marshals Service ("Marshals Service") to attempt service of the Complaint. (emt, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/13/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statements)(ens) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Larry Keller. (ens)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ala Wai State Boat Harbor, filed by Larry Keller.(ens)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller v. Ala Wai State Boat Harbor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ala Wai State Boat Harbor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?