Taylor v. Bartolucci, Jr.
Plaintiff: Tammy Sue Taylor
Defendant: William L. Bartolucci, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00494
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 20 CONCISE STATEMENT in Support re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant/Counterclaimant's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by William L. Bartolucci, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William L. Bartolucci, #2 Declaration Of Counsel, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Certificate of Service)(Zalewski, John)
November 1, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant/Counterclaimant's Motion For Summary Judgment John D. Zalewski appearing for Counter Claimant William L. Bartolucci, Jr., Defendant William L. Bartolucci, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service)(Zalewski, John) Modified attachment description on 11/6/2019 (ens).
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by William L. Bartolucci, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zalewski, John)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on October 22, 2019. (bbb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates are given. Court to prepare a Scheduling Order.Non-Jury Trial is set for 10/19/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 09/08/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 12/02/2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 07/09/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 05/20/2020. Discovery due by 08/20/2020. (FTR-Ctrm C6 9:28 - 9:33.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
October 14, 2019 Filing 15 Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Tammy Sue Taylor's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Holm, Matthew) Docket text modified on 10/15/2019 (emt, ).
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant /Counterclaimant William L. Bartolucci, Jr.'s Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zalewski, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 First Amended Answer To Complaint Filed August 26, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by William L. Bartolucci, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zalewski, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zalewski, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Tammy Sue Taylor's ANSWER to #6 Counterclaim for Ejectment of Plaintiff from the Subject Property and Other Relief Filed September 13, 2019 , ANSWER to #6 Counterclaim by Tammy Sue Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service )(Holm, Matthew) Docket text modified on 10/3/2019 (emt, ).
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 EO: In light of Defendant's 9/23/19 Response, the Court takes no further action on its Order to Show Cause Why This Action Should Not be Remanded. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(otake1)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #8 Order to Show Cause,,, Defendant's Response To [DKT. 8]Order To Show Cause Why This Action Should Not be Remanded filed by William L. Bartolucci, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Declaration of William L. Bartolucci, Jr., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Certificate of Service)(Zalewski, John)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 9/17/2019. Accordingly, Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant must file a response to this Order to Show Cause by September 30, 2019, showing, by a preponderance of the evidence, that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. Failure to timely respond to this Order to Show Cause will result in a finding that Defendant has failed to carry his burden of establishing subject matter jurisdiction and the Court will remand this action. Show Cause Response due by 9/30/2019. (emt, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS FROM THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAII; CV 19-1-1347-08 11th Div. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Complaint; Summons, #4 Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court; Exhibits A-B; Certificate of Service) (emt, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 COUNTERCLAIM For Ejectment of Plaintiff From The Subject Property And Other Relief against Tammy Sue Taylor, COUNTERCLAIM For Ejectment of Plaintiff From The Subject Property And Other Relief against Tammy Sue Taylor, filed by William L. Bartolucci, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Certificate of Service)(Zalewski, John) Modified on 9/16/2019 to remove duplicate parties (emt, ).
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint Filed August 26, 2019 by William L. Bartolucci, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zalewski, John)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 10/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00494-JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by William L. Bartolucci, Jr.. (Zalewski, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by William L. Bartolucci, Jr. from First Circuit Court, case number 19-1-1347-08. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2260842), filed by William L. Bartolucci, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(Zalewski, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Bartolucci, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Sue Taylor
Represented By: Richard T. Forrester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L. Bartolucci, Jr.
Represented By: John D. Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?