Trustees of the Operating Engineers' Trust Funds v. Cherry Creek Recycling, LLC
Plaintiff: Hawaii Operating Engineers Industry Stabilization Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Pensioned Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre Apprentice, Apprentice and Journeyman Affirmation Action Training Fund for Hawaii, Hawaii Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Hawaii Operating Engineers Annuity Trust Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers' Trust Funds and Pension Trust Fund
Defendant: Cherry Creek Recycling, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00495
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST Entry of Default by Hawaii Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Hawaii Operating Engineers Annuity Trust Fund, Hawaii Operating Engineers Industry Stabilization Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre Apprentice, Apprentice and Journeyman Affirmation Action Training Fund for Hawaii, Pension Trust Fund, Pensioned Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 Declaration of Ryan Ilacqua, #3 Statement of Amounts Due, #4 [Proposed] Default Judgment, #5 Certificate of Service)(Ikeda, Ashley)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 EO: Based on the entry of default, the Court VACATES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2019 and DIRECTS Plaintiffs to file the appropriate motion for default judgment no later than 12/2/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Cherry Creek Recycling, LLC re: #9 (jo)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST Entry of Default by Trustees of the Operating Engineers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 Exhibit A, #3 [Proposed] Entry of Default)(Ikeda, Ashley)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Operating Engineers' Trust Funds. All Defendants served on 9/29/2019. (Ikeda, Ashley) Docket Entry Modified on 10/8/2019 (jo)
September 12, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket number #7 EX PARTE Motion Ex Parte Motion for Order Directing Issuance of Summons by Publication was filed incorrectly in this case. Please be advised that the document is captioned for filing in CV 19-00334 ACK-WRP; Hawaii Tapers' Trust Funds, et al. vs. Leite. The Clerk's Office will terminate the motion in this case. (emt, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 refer to Advisory Entry: EX PARTE Motion Ex Parte Motion for Order Directing Issuance of Summons by Publication (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jerry P.S. Chang, #2 Declaration of Ira Hookano, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 [Proposed] Order Directing Issuance of Summons by Publication, #11 [Proposed] Summons) (Chang, Jerry) Modified on 9/12/2019 (emt, ).
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/13/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cherry Creek Recycling, LLC. (emt, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00495 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Trustees of the Operating Engineers' Trust Funds. (Chang, Jerry)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against Cherry Creek Recycling, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2261237.), filed by Trustees of the Operating Engineers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 [Proposed] Summons)(Chang, Jerry) Modified on 9/12/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Operating Engineers' Trust Funds v. Cherry Creek Recycling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Operating Engineers Industry Stabilization Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre Apprentice, Apprentice and Journeyman Affirmation Action Training Fund for Hawaii
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Operating Engineers
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Operating Engineers Annuity Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers' Trust Funds
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Creek Recycling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?