United States for the use and benefit of Impact Environments, Inc.; et al. v. David Boland, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States for the use and benefit of Impact Environments, Inc., John Devon DePaulis and Impact Environments, Inc.
Defendant: David Boland, Inc. and Western Surety Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00505
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Certificate of Service Anna H. Oshiro appearing for Defendants Western Surety Company, David Boland, Inc. (Oshiro, Anna)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Impact Environments, Inc., John Devon DePaulis. Western Surety Company. (Feeley, Stuart)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 EO: By joint agreement of counsel, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 11/18/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 12/04/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 11/27/2019. Counsel Stuart T. Feeley to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Impact Environments, Inc., John Devon DePaulis. David Boland, Inc.. (Feeley, Stuart)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Tung on behalf of John Devon DePaulis, Impact Environments, Inc. on behalf of John Devon DePaulis, Impact Environments, Inc.. (Tung, Jennifer) Modified on 10/8/2019 (emt, ).
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Western Surety Company. (emt, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to David Boland, Inc. (emt, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Tung on behalf of John Devon DePaulis, Impact Environments, Inc. on behalf of John Devon DePaulis, Impact Environments, Inc.. (Tung, Jennifer)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Feeley, Stuart)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons (Proposed) (Feeley, Stuart)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Impact Environments, Inc., John Devon DePaulis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Miller Act Bond, #2 Exhibit B: Subcontract, #3 Exhibit C: Mediation Report)(Feeley, Stuart) Docket text modified on 9/27/2019 (emt, ).
September 19, 2019 PAYMENT of Fees - Payment for Complaint Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0975-2265003.. (Feeley, Stuart)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 11/18/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00505 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs David Boland, Inc., Western Surety Company , filed by United States for the use and benefit of Impact Environments, Inc., John Devon DePaulis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Miller Act Bond, #2 Exhibit Subcontract, #3 Exhibit Mediation Report)(Feeley, Stuart) Docket text modified on 9/19/2019 (emt, ). Modified on 9/20/2019 (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0975-2265003) (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States for the use and benefit of Impact Environments, Inc.; et al. v. David Boland, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Boland, Inc.
Represented By: Anna H. Oshiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Anna H. Oshiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States for the use and benefit of Impact Environments, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart T. Feeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Devon DePaulis
Represented By: Stuart T. Feeley
Represented By: Jennifer Tung
Represented By: Blake W. Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Impact Environments, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart T. Feeley
Represented By: Jennifer Tung
Represented By: Blake W. Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?