Kretz v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kainoa K. Kretz
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-5, Doe Corporations 1-5, John Does 1-5, Doe LLCs 1-5, United Airlines, Inc., Doe Non-Profit Organizations 1-5, Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5 and Jane Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2019cv00506
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 11/05/2019. (apg, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - Pro Se Plaintiff Kainoa K. Kretz present.Court informs Mr. Kretz that it is his responsibility to follow all Court rules, procedures and orders, and he must meet all deadlines.Non Jury Trial is set for 11/9/20 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Watson.A Telephone Status Conference is set for 2/5/20 @ 9:00 a.m.Parties do not need to submit anything in advance of the conference.Court to issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order.Dates given: Non-Jury Trial is set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/29/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 8/13/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Status Conference is set for 2/5/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/10/2020. Discovery due by 9/11/2020. (FTR-Ctrm FTR C5 (9:07 - 9:22).) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Kainoa Kretz has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 INITIAL DISCLOSURES; Certificate of Service by Kainoa K. Kretz. (apg, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Airlines, Inc. [Re: Defendant United Airlines, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)] (Zorc, Eileen)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Zorc, Eileen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 [AMENDED DOCUMENT] AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT; Certificate of Service to #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Airlines, Inc . (Zorc, Eileen) Modified on 10/16/2019 (emt, ).
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Planning Meeting JOINT REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING. (Zorc, Eileen)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Airlines, Inc. (RE: DEFENDANT UNITED AIRLINES, INC.S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF KAINOA K. KRETZ) (Zorc, Eileen)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Airlines, Inc. (RE: DEFENDANT UNITED AIRLINES, INC.S FIRST REQUEST FOR ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF KAINOA K. KRETZ) (Zorc, Eileen)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 EO: The Court reschedules the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/19 @ 9:00 AM to 11/4/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 10/28/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS FROM THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAII; CV 19-1-0290-02 11th Div. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Summons, #5 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (United Airlines, Inc), #6 Answer to Complaint; Certificate of Service, #7 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Exhibit "1"; Certificate of Service) (emt, )
September 20, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the 3 Notice of Case Assignment and #4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference has been served by First Class Mail to Kainoa K. Kretz at the address of record on September 20, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Tang on behalf of United Airlines, Inc. on behalf of United Airlines, Inc.. (Tang, Ronald)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Airlines, Inc. for United Airlines, Inc... (Zorc, Eileen)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 10/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00506 DKW-RT on all further pleadings . (jo)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by United Airlines, Inc.. (Zorc, Eileen)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Airlines, Inc. DEFENDANT UNITED AIRLLINES, INC.'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 19-1-0290-02. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2265203), filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dorota Karpierz, #2 Exhibit A ( Complaint; Summons - CV 19-1-0290-02 11th Div.) , #3 Declaration of Eileen C. Zorc, #4 Exhibit B ( Defendant United Airlines, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint; Certificate of Service - CV 19-1-0290-02) , #5 Certificate of Service)(Zorc, Eileen) Docket text modified on 9/20/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kretz v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe LLCs 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Tang
Represented By: Eileen C. Zorc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Non-Profit Organizations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kainoa K. Kretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?